All Bills - Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR288
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Confirm the reappointment of Matthew Russell Hinton to the Kentucky Agricultural Development Board for a term expiring July 6, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR289
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Passed
4/15/24
Honor the 2023-2024 University of Kentucky men's basketball team, players, and accomplishments.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR29
Introduced
1/2/24
Refer
1/2/24
Refer
1/3/24
Passed
1/29/24
Honor the life and accomplishments of former Kentucky Governor Brereton Chandler Jones.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR290
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Passed
4/12/24
Honor the Morehead State University Eagles men's basketball team, 2024 Ohio Valley Conference Champions.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR291
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Refer
4/12/24
Passed
4/12/24
Commemorate the occasion of the 200th anniversary of Oldham County.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR293
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of William David Donan to the Mine Safety Review Commission for a term expiring May 23, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR294
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Amber Powell to the Board of Nursing for a term expiring June 30, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR295
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Mary Pat Regan to the Public Service Commission for a term expiring July 1, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR296
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Michael Berry to the Kentucky State Fair Board for a term expiring June 5, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR297
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Tony Colyer to the Board of Tax Appeals for a term expiring June 29, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR298
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Karen Sherfey to the Board of Nursing for a term expiring June 30, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR299
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Miriam Haas to the Board of Nursing for a term expiring June 30, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR3
Introduced
1/8/24
Refer
1/8/24
Refer
1/10/24
Honor Senator Whitney H. Westerfield upon the occasion of his retirement from the General Assembly.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR30
Introduced
1/2/24
Refer
1/2/24
Refer
1/3/24
Passed
2/29/24
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of Judy Taylor.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR300
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Diana F. Berry to the Education Professional Standards Board for a term expiring June 30, 2026.