All Bills - Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR301
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Sarah Weedman to the Education Professional Standards Board for a term expiring June 30, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR302
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Amy Shearer Lingo to the Education Professional Standards Board for a term expiring June 30, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR303
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Cathy Chanelle Gunn to the Education Professional Standards Board for a term expiring June 30, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR304
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Andrew Belcher to the Governor's Postsecondary Education Nominating Committee for a term expiring April 14, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR305
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Amy Roe Leenerts to the Crime Victims Compensation Board for a term expiring July 1, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR306
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of James Paul Cousins to the Education Professional Standards Board for a term expiring June 30, 2025.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR307
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Christopher John Fryer to the Education Professional Standards Board for a term expiring June 30, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR308
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Darris Russell to the Mine Safety Review Commission for a term expiring April 24, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR309
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Mary G. Eaves to the Board of Trustees of the Kentucky Retirement Systems for a term expiring June 21, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR31
Introduced
1/2/24
Refer
1/2/24
Refer
1/3/24
Passed
3/22/24
Adjourn the Senate in honor and loving memory of Joseph Richard Wright.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR310
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Caswell Prewitt Lane to the Board of Trustees of the Kentucky Retirement Systems for a term expiring June 17, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR311
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of William Henry Jones Jr. to the Board of Directors of the Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance Authority for a term expiring December 31, 2025.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR312
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Diana W. Woods to the Kentucky Board of Education for a term expiring April 14, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR313
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Pamela Fettig Thompson to the Board of Trustees of the Kentucky Retirement Systems for a term expiring June 17, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR314
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Dr. Thomas Gerald Abell to the Kentucky Lottery Corporation Board of Directors for a term expiring November 28, 2027.