All Bills - Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR329
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Elizabeth Griffin McCoy to the University of Kentucky Board of Trustees for a term expiring June 30, 2028.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR33
Introduced
1/2/24
Refer
1/2/24
Refer
1/3/24
Passed
1/8/24
Adjourn the Senate in honor and loving memory of Representative Lamin Swann.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR330
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Derrick Helm to the Kentucky Lottery Corporation Board of Directors for a term expiring November 28, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR331
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Gary Robertson to the Kentucky Public Transportation Infrastructure Authority for a term expiring April 28, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR332
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Benjamin L. Hale to the Board of Directors of the Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance Authority for a term expiring December 31, 2025.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR333
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Gary Greene to the Fish and Wildlife Resources Commission for a term expiring on December 31, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR334
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Robert W. Casada to the Board of Directors of Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance Authority for a term expiring December 31, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR335
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Edward Hoppy Bennett to the Kentucky State Fair Board for a term expiring May 10, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR336
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Passed
4/12/24
Recognize the Harlan County High School Black Bears Boys' Basketball team, 2024 KHSAA Sweet Sixteen runners-up.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR337
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Refer
4/15/24
Passed
4/15/24
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of Brady Delaney.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR338
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Passed
4/12/24
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of Randall Gene McPeek.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR339
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Passed
4/12/24
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of Mary Jo Keene.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR34
Introduced
1/2/24
Refer
1/2/24
Refer
1/3/24
Passed
3/22/24
Honor the life and accomplishments of former Kentucky State Representative Royce Adams.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR340
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Passed
4/12/24
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of Carl Fields.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR341
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Passed
4/12/24
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of David Fon Childers.