All Bills - Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR356
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of G.L. Ovey to the Murray State University Board of Regents for a term expiring July 9, 2029.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR357
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Matthew Edwin Price to the Murray State University Board of Regents for a term expiring June 30, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR358
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Passed
4/12/24
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of Jessica Hill.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR359
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Refer
4/15/24
Passed
4/15/24
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of James O. Burton and Teresa Ann Burton.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR36
Introduced
1/2/24
Refer
1/2/24
Failed
1/3/24
Honor the life and accomplishments of former Kentucky Governor Julian Morton Carroll.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR360
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Refer
4/15/24
Passed
4/15/24
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of Janice Bowling Wesley.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR361
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Refer
4/15/24
Passed
4/15/24
Recognize the City of Harrodsburg on the occasion of the 250th anniversary of its founding.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR362
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Dr. David Williams to the Kentucky State Fair Board for a term expiring May 10, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR363
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the appointment of Walter Robertson to the Fish and Wildlife Commission for a term expiring December 31, 2027.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR364
Introduced
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Refer
4/15/24
Confirm the reappointment of Joe T. Goggin to the Kentucky State Fair Board for a term expiring May 10, 2026.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR365
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Refer
4/15/24
Passed
4/15/24
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of Cecil F. Dunn.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR366
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Refer
4/15/24
Passed
4/15/24
Recognize historic and economic significance of the Capital Plaza Hotel.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR368
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Refer
4/15/24
Passed
4/15/24
Recognize and commend the 40 public schools throughout the Commonwealth that participate in the Kentucky Community School Initiative.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR369
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Amend the Rules 4 and 49 of the Rules of Procedure for the 2024 Regular Session of the Senate.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR37
Introduced
1/2/24
Refer
1/2/24
Refer
1/3/24
Passed
4/12/24
Adjourn in loving memory and honor of former State Representative Hubert Collins.