All Bills - Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR141
Introduced
3/21/24
Refer
3/21/24
Refer
3/25/24
Passed
3/26/24
Recognize April 2024 as Child Abuse Prevention in Kentucky Month.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR142
Introduced
3/21/24
Refer
3/21/24
Recognize May 16, 2024 as Tarlov Cyst Disease Day.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR143
Introduced
3/21/24
Refer
3/21/24
Refer
3/27/24
Passed
3/27/24
Recognize October 2024 as National Arts and Humanities Month in Kentucky.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR144
Introduced
3/22/24
Refer
3/22/24
Urge the Kentucky Department of Education to explore and implement flexibilities within the federal assessment and accountability requirements regarding English learners to improve circumstances for the students and schools.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR145
Introduced
3/25/24
Refer
3/25/24
Refer
3/26/24
Passed
3/27/24
Recognize July 20, 2024, as Western Kentucky University Pershing Rifles and Rebelettes Day.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR146
Introduced
3/25/24
Refer
3/25/24
Passed
4/12/24
Recognize April 18, 2024, as National Lineman Appreciation Day.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR148
Introduced
3/27/24
Refer
3/27/24
Refer
3/28/24
Passed
3/28/24
Recognize April 2, 2024, as World Autism Awareness Day and April 2024 as Autism Acceptance Month.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR15
Introduced
1/2/24
Refer
1/2/24
Amend Rule 48 of the Rules of Procedure for the 2024 Regular Session of the House of Representatives.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR150
Introduced
3/28/24
Refer
3/28/24
Urge the United States Congress to amend the Fair Credit Reporting Act to prohibit the practice of consumer reporting agencies selling or otherwise furnishing trigger leads relating to a consumer without the consumer's prior consent.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR152
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Refer
4/15/24
Passed
4/15/24
Urge the United States Congress and the Kentucky Congressional delegation to designate Big Bone Lick State Historic Site as a national historical park and the Kentucky Tourism, Arts and Heritage Cabinet to work in conjunction with the United States Congress and the United States Department of the Interior to facilitate this designation.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR153
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Passed
4/12/24
Condemn the support of Hamas, Hezbollah, and other terrorist organizations at institutions of higher education.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR154
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Passed
4/12/24
Honor Edsel Welch on the occasion of his 100th birthday.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR155
Introduced
4/12/24
Refer
4/12/24
Refer
4/15/24
Passed
4/15/24
Honor the life of Madelynn Troutt and recognize April 15, 2024, as Live Like Madelynn Day in Kentucky.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR16
Introduced
1/2/24
Refer
1/2/24
Amend Rule 41 of the Rules of Procedure for the 2024 Regular Session of the House of Representatives.
KY
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HR17
Introduced
1/2/24
Refer
1/2/24
Adopt the Rules of Procedure for the 2024 Regular Session of the House of Representatives.