All Bills - Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR164

Introduced
2/20/24  
Refer
2/20/24  
Designate the Jim and Mary Jo Sharpe Memorial Bridge in Pulaski County and erect appropriate signage.
KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR166

Introduced
2/21/24  
Refer
2/21/24  
Direct the Transportation Cabinet to include Richie Weems and the Continental Five on the Country Music Highway and place signs on US Highway 23 in Pike County denoting the designation.
KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR170

Introduced
2/22/24  
Refer
2/22/24  
Refer
2/26/24  
Report Pass
3/7/24  
Engrossed
3/13/24  
Refer
3/13/24  
Refer
3/15/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Refer
4/12/24  
Enrolled
4/15/24  
Enrolled
4/15/24  
Chaptered
4/17/24  
Directs the Council on Postsecondary Education to conduct a study on expanding postbaccalaureate program offerings at comprehensive universities; and directs the council to consult with each president of a comprehensive university to consider a regional economic development or workforce development need that may be met by a postbaccalaureate program.
KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR175

Introduced
2/21/24  
Refer
2/21/24  
Refer
2/23/24  
Report Pass
2/28/24  
Engrossed
3/4/24  
Refer
3/4/24  
Refer
3/5/24  
Report Pass
3/6/24  
Refer
3/25/24  
Enrolled
3/27/24  
Enrolled
3/27/24  
Chaptered
4/4/24  
Directs the Public Service Commission to promulgate emergency administrative regulations on utility pole attachments for broadband service providers that will address the backlog of pole attachment requests; establishes parameters for preventing delays and backlogs of requests; requires the Public Service Commission to open a docket to receive comments and requests from affected parties; and requires the Public Service Commission to issue a quarterly report to the Legislative Research Commission beginning September 30, 2024; EMERGENCY.
KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR176

Introduced
2/23/24  
Refer
2/23/24  
Refer
2/26/24  
Report Pass
3/14/24  
Engrossed
3/15/24  
Refer
3/15/24  
Refer
3/15/24  
Report Pass
3/21/24  
Enrolled
4/12/24  
Enrolled
4/12/24  
Establish the Workforce Attraction and Retention Task Force; list duties and members of the task force; require the task force to meet monthly during the 2024 Interim of the General Assembly; require the Cabinet for Economic Development to hire the consulting and strategic firm and provide a report to the task force by November 1, 2024; require the task force to submit a report by December 1, 2024, for referral to the appropriate committee or committees by December 31, 2024; EMERGENCY.
KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR179

Introduced
2/27/24  
Refer
2/27/24  
Refer
2/29/24  
Report Pass
3/14/24  
Engrossed
3/15/24  
Refer
3/15/24  
Refer
3/22/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Refer
4/12/24  
Enrolled
4/15/24  
Enrolled
4/15/24  
Chaptered
4/19/24  
Directs the Kentucky Community and Technical College System to report findings and present action steps on improving and advancing the system to the Legislative Research Commission by December 10, 2024.
KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR188

Introduced
2/27/24  
Refer
2/27/24  
Direct the Transportation Cabinet to designate a portion of Kentucky Route 292 in Martin County as the PFC Larry Gene Ratliff Memorial Highway.
KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR190

Introduced
2/28/24  
Refer
2/28/24  
Direct the Transportation Cabinet to designate a portion of Kentucky Route 2049 in Jefferson County as the Cozy and Linnes Chester Memorial Highway.
KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR192

Introduced
2/28/24  
Refer
2/28/24  
Direct the Transportation Cabinet to designate the Representative Hubert and Bea Collins Memorial Bridges in Johnson County.
KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR194

Introduced
2/28/24  
Refer
2/28/24  
Refer
3/1/24  
Report Pass
3/14/24  
Engrossed
3/15/24  
Urge the United States Congress and the Kentucky Congressional delegation to designate Big Bone Lick State Historic Site as a national historical park; direct the Kentucky Tourism, Arts and Heritage Cabinet to work in conjunction with the United States Congress and the United States Department of the Interior to facilitate this designation.
KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR195

Introduced
2/28/24  
Refer
2/28/24  
Direct the Transportation Cabinet to designate the L.G. Frazier Memorial Bridge on Kentucky Route 122 in Floyd County.
KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR25

Introduced
1/2/24  
Refer
1/2/24  
Designate a portion of Kentucky Route 371 in Kenton County as the Michael Scott "Bubba" Wilson Memorial Highway.
KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR26

Introduced
1/2/24  
Refer
1/2/24  
Direct the Transportation Cabinet to designate a portion of Kentucky Route 49 in Marion County as the Tom Brahm Memorial Highway.
KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR58

Introduced
1/9/24  
Refer
1/9/24  
Refer
1/11/24  
Report Pass
3/13/24  
Engrossed
3/22/24  
Refer
3/22/24  
Refer
3/25/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Refer
4/15/24  
Enrolled
4/15/24  
Enrolled
4/15/24  
Chaptered
4/19/24  
Directs the Transportation Cabinet to designate memorial highways and bridges throughout the state and erect appropriate signage; and directs the Transportation Cabinet to honor individuals with signs on the Country Music Highway, United States Route 23.
KY

Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SJR84

Introduced
1/18/24  
Refer
1/18/24  
Apply to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for the calling of a convention of the states limited to proposing amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraint on the federal government, limit the powers and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office for its officials and members of Congress; direct the Secretary of State to send copies of the joint resolution to certain federal and state officials; state that the application should be continuing until the legislatures of at least two-thirds of the states have made applications on the subject.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records