All Bills - Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR74
Introduced
4/21/14
Introduced
4/21/14
Passed
4/22/14
Passed
4/22/14
Commends Kris Cangelosi on being selected to receive the Arts Leadership Award at the 2014 Louisiana Culture Awards.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR75
Introduced
4/21/14
Passed
4/22/14
Passed
4/22/14
Commends, recognizes, and welcomes Canadian visitors in Louisiana to mark the celebration of the 25th Anniversary of the twinning of the communities of Dieppe in Acadia in New Brunswick, and Carencro on April 23, 2014, at the Mercredi Show at Pelican Park in Carencro.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR76
Introduced
4/21/14
Passed
4/22/14
Expresses condolences upon the death of Randy Lamana, East Baton Rouge Parish School Board member.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR77
Introduced
4/21/14
Introduced
4/21/14
Passed
4/21/14
Passed
4/21/14
Commends President Scott Cowen and Tulane University for a tradition of academic excellence and to designate Tuesday, April 22, 2014 as Tulane University at the Louisiana Legislature.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR78
Introduced
4/22/14
Passed
4/23/14
Commends the Northwestern State Lady Demons on their Southland Conference Tournament win and appearance in the NCAA Women's Basketball Tournament.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR79
Introduced
4/22/14
Passed
4/23/14
Passed
4/23/14
Commends Southern University and recognizes Monday, April 28, 2014, as Southern University Day at the Capitol.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR8
Introduced
3/11/14
Passed
3/12/14
Passed
3/12/14
Commends Caroline Boley on her numerous accomplishments, her exemplary and impressive academic achievements, and on being selected as a recipient of the LSU University Medal.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR80
Introduced
4/22/14
Introduced
4/22/14
Passed
4/23/14
Passed
4/23/14
Designates May 3, 2014, as "Pancreatic Cancer Awareness Day in Louisiana" and commends the efforts of Ronnie Edwards in raising pancreatic cancer awareness.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR81
Introduced
4/22/14
Introduced
4/22/14
Passed
4/22/14
Passed
4/22/14
Designates Wednesday April 23, 2014, as Union Bethel AME Church Day.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR82
Introduced
4/22/14
Passed
4/23/14
Commends the Louisiana Northeastern Berith District of the Southern Region of the Full Gospel Baptist Church Fellowship International, recognizes the 2014 District Conference being held in Ruston, and acknowledges District Overseer Wilson G. Fields Sr.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR83
Introduced
4/23/14
Introduced
4/23/14
Passed
4/24/14
Commends Union Parish High School football team on winning the Class 3A state championship.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR84
Introduced
4/23/14
Introduced
4/23/14
Passed
4/24/14
Passed
4/24/14
Extends sincere condolences upon the death of Francis Grayson Jr. of Baton Rouge.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR85
Introduced
4/24/14
Introduced
4/24/14
Passed
4/28/14
Passed
4/28/14
Recognizes Tuesday, April 29, 2014, as Lemonade Day for Cypress Springs Elementary School in Ruston, Louisiana.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR86
Introduced
4/24/14
Introduced
4/24/14
Passed
4/28/14
Passed
4/28/14
Recognizes Thursday, May 1, 2014, as Lemonade Day for Ruston Elementary School in Ruston, Louisiana.
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR87
Introduced
4/28/14
Introduced
4/28/14
Passed
4/29/14
Passed
4/29/14
Commends the service and contributions of Magellan Youth Leaders Inspiring Future Empowerment (MY LIFE) and recognizes Thursday, May 8, 2014, as MY LIFE Youth Day at the State Capitol.