All Bills - Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR32

Introduced
4/13/15  
Introduced
4/13/15  
Passed
4/14/15  
Passed
4/14/15  
Engrossed
4/15/15  
Commends posthumously law enforcement officers from the Acadiana region who died or were slain in the line of duty.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR33

Introduced
4/14/15  
Introduced
4/14/15  
Passed
5/6/15  
Passed
5/6/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Commends the Public Administration Institute Student Association (PAISA) at Louisiana State University and to recognize April 13, 2015, as the seventeenth annual PAISA Day at the Louisiana Legislature.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR34

Introduced
4/14/15  
Introduced
4/14/15  
Refer
4/27/15  
Refer
4/27/15  
Report Pass
5/6/15  
Report Pass
5/6/15  
Passed
5/11/15  
Passed
5/11/15  
Engrossed
5/12/15  
Engrossed
5/12/15  
Refer
5/13/15  
Refer
5/13/15  
Report Pass
5/20/15  
Requests the Department of Health and Hospitals, the Department of Education, the Medicaid managed care organizations, and representatives of the Whole Child Initiative to work together to develop a plan to implement the Whole School, Whole Community, Whole Child model developed by the United States Centers for Disease Control and Prevention.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR35

Introduced
4/14/15  
Introduced
4/14/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Engrossed
4/15/15  
Commends Charles "Charlie" Adams for being named as one of the top ten 2014 pilots for Pilots for Patients.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR36

Introduced
4/14/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Engrossed
4/15/15  
Commends Anderson "Andy" W. Barham for being named one of the top ten 2014 pilots for Pilots for Patients.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR37

Introduced
4/14/15  
Introduced
4/14/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Engrossed
4/15/15  
Commends the Louisiana Developmental Disabilities Council and its grassroots advocacy network, LaCAN, for its advocacy efforts to support that people with disabilities be allowed to live independently and become integrated and included in all facets of community living, and to designate April 29, 2015, as Disability Rights Day in Louisiana.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR38

Introduced
4/15/15  
Passed
4/20/15  
Passed
4/20/15  
Engrossed
4/21/15  
Extends the Louisiana Legislature's condolences on the death of former state Senator Erle Edwards Barham.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR39

Introduced
4/15/15  
Introduced
4/15/15  
Passed
4/20/15  
Passed
4/20/15  
Commends Melanie Benit for her time as Chairwoman of the Louisiana Federation of College Republicans.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR4

Introduced
4/1/15  
Refer
4/1/15  
Suspends from July 1, 2015, through June 30, 2016, certain exclusions, exemptions, deductions, or credits against the corporation income tax and the corporation franchise tax.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR40

Introduced
4/15/15  
Introduced
4/15/15  
Passed
4/20/15  
Passed
4/20/15  
Engrossed
4/21/15  
Commends Destin Sensky for his time as President of the Louisiana State University College Republicans.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR41

Introduced
4/15/15  
Introduced
4/15/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Engrossed
4/15/15  
Declares April 22, 2015, as Youth Equine Day at the Legislature.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR42

Introduced
4/15/15  
Passed
4/21/15  
Passed
4/21/15  
Engrossed
4/22/15  
Engrossed
4/22/15  
Refer
4/27/15  
Refer
4/27/15  
Report Pass
5/13/15  
Authorizes and directs the Louisiana Emergency Response Network (LERN) to organize and facilitate a working group of healthcare providers who deal with victims of trauma to develop recommendations for a Level III Trauma Center in Northeast Louisiana.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR43

Introduced
4/20/15  
Introduced
4/20/15  
Passed
4/21/15  
Passed
4/21/15  
Engrossed
4/21/15  
Expresses the recognition of the Louisiana Legislature on the need for colorectal cancer screening examinations.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR44

Introduced
4/20/15  
Passed
4/21/15  
Passed
4/21/15  
Engrossed
4/21/15  
Expresses condolences upon the death of Mrs. Willie McCullor Landry.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR45

Introduced
4/20/15  
Introduced
4/20/15  
Refer
4/21/15  
Report Pass
5/26/15  
Report Pass
5/26/15  
Passed
5/27/15  
Engrossed
5/27/15  
Engrossed
5/27/15  
Refer
5/28/15  
Requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study and make recommendations regarding Civil Code Article 2628 and contracts predating such article that contain no specified term for an option or right of first refusal.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records