All Bills - Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR32

Introduced
4/13/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Expresses condolences upon the death of Charles Tubre
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR33

Introduced
4/13/15  
Introduced
4/13/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Commends the Neighborhood Development Foundation for its service to the community
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR34

Introduced
4/13/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Recognizes April as Louisiana Crawfish Month
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR35

Introduced
4/13/15  
Introduced
4/13/15  
Refer
4/14/15  
Report Pass
4/27/15  
Report Pass
4/27/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Passed
5/11/15  
Requests that the U.S. Postal Service consider assigning a new zip code to the town of Richwood in Ouachita Parish
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR36

Introduced
4/13/15  
Introduced
4/13/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Recognizes Wednesday, May 13, 2015, as Liquefied Natural Gas Day at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR37

Introduced
4/13/15  
Introduced
4/13/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Recognizes Tuesday, April 14, 2015, as Equal Pay Day in Louisiana
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR38

Introduced
4/13/15  
Introduced
4/13/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Commends Xavier University President Norman Francis upon his retirement
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR39

Introduced
4/13/15  
Introduced
4/13/15  
Refer
4/14/15  
Refer
4/14/15  
Report Pass
4/29/15  
Report Pass
4/29/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Refer
5/7/15  
Report Pass
5/27/15  
Report Pass
5/27/15  
Passed
6/1/15  
Requests the House and Governmental Affairs and Senate and Governmental Affairs committees to meet and function as a joint committee to study the advisability of reducing the number of signatures required to have a recall election
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR4

Introduced
3/27/15  
Introduced
3/27/15  
Refer
3/27/15  
Refer
3/27/15  
Refer
4/13/15  
Report Pass
4/21/15  
Report Pass
4/21/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Refer
5/7/15  
Refer
5/7/15  
Report Pass
5/13/15  
Report Pass
5/13/15  
Passed
5/20/15  
Expresses the intent of the legislature regarding the standard of care prescribed by law for the practice of telemedicine
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR40

Introduced
4/13/15  
Introduced
4/13/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Commemorates the life of Kate Lemon, senior librarian with the David R. Poynter Legislative Research Library
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR41

Introduced
4/13/15  
Introduced
4/13/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Recognizes Wednesday, April 22, 2015, as National Multiple Sclerosis Society Louisiana State Action Day at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR42

Introduced
4/13/15  
Introduced
4/13/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Commends Chicken Shack of Baton Rouge upon its eightieth year anniversary
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR43

Introduced
4/13/15  
Engrossed
4/14/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Recognizes November 13, 2013, through November 11, 2025, as the commemoration of the 50th Anniversary of the Vietnam War
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR44

Introduced
4/14/15  
Introduced
4/14/15  
Refer
4/15/15  
Refer
4/15/15  
Report Pass
4/29/15  
Report Pass
4/29/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Refer
5/7/15  
Refer
5/7/15  
Report Pass
5/13/15  
Requests all state agencies in the executive branch of state government to provide for a crisis leave pool and requests the Department of State Civil Service to report progress to the legislature
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR45

Introduced
4/14/15  
Introduced
4/14/15  
Refer
4/15/15  
Directs the legislative auditor to conduct certain audits to identify unpaid severance tax payments

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records