All Bills - Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR50
Introduced
4/17/19
Passed
4/22/19
Recognizes the services of local school board members and local school superintendents and declares Tuesday, May 14, 2019, as School Board Member and School Superintendent Recognition Day.
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR51
Introduced
4/17/19
Introduced
4/17/19
Passed
4/22/19
Passed
4/22/19
Commends Mary P. Morain upon her induction into the St. Landry Parish Democratic Party Hall of Fame.
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR52
Introduced
4/17/19
Passed
4/22/19
Passed
4/22/19
Commends Charles Cravins upon his induction into the St. Landry Parish Democratic Party Hall of Fame.
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR53
Introduced
4/17/19
Introduced
4/17/19
Passed
4/22/19
Passed
4/22/19
Commends Sheriff Bobby Guidroz on his induction into the St. Landry Parish Democratic Party Hall of Fame.
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR54
Introduced
4/22/19
Introduced
4/22/19
Passed
4/23/19
Passed
4/23/19
Commends Joe Cormier III, on his 2019 induction into the International Babe Ruth Hall of Fame and for his many achievements in youth baseball.
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR55
Introduced
4/22/19
Introduced
4/22/19
Passed
4/23/19
Passed
4/23/19
Commends Carroll Breaux, mayor of the city of Springhill, for 28 years of dedicated public service on the occasion of his retirement.
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR56
Introduced
4/22/19
Introduced
4/22/19
Passed
4/22/19
Passed
4/22/19
Designates Tuesday, April 23, 2019, as Winn-Dixie Day at the legislature and commends Winn-Dixie for its commitment to Louisiana.
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR57
Introduced
4/22/19
Passed
4/23/19
Passed
4/23/19
Recognizes April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and designates April 13, 2019, as Sarcoidosis Awareness Day at the state capitol.
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR58
Introduced
4/22/19
Introduced
4/22/19
Passed
4/23/19
Passed
4/23/19
Commends the Southern Mutual Help Association, Inc. on 50 years of working for social and employment equality.
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR59
Introduced
4/22/19
Introduced
4/22/19
Passed
4/23/19
Passed
4/23/19
Recognizes April 25, 2019, as Jack and Jill Day at the capitol.
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR6
Introduced
4/8/19
Introduced
4/8/19
Passed
4/9/19
Passed
4/9/19
Commends Mason William Andrews on being certified as the youngest pilot to fly solo around the world by Guinness World Records.
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR60
Introduced
4/22/19
Passed
4/23/19
Passed
4/23/19
Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated and designates Thursday, April 25, 2019, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol.
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR61
Introduced
4/23/19
Introduced
4/23/19
Passed
4/23/19
Passed
4/23/19
Commends the members of the Louisiana Athletic Trainers Association for their dedicated hard work on behalf of the athletes of Louisiana and designates April 23, 2019, as Louisiana Athletic Trainers Association Day at the state capitol.
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR62
Introduced
4/23/19
Passed
4/24/19
Commends Bernhard LLC for 100 years of operation.
LA
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR63
Introduced
4/23/19
Introduced
4/23/19
Passed
4/24/19
Passed
4/24/19
Designates May 9, 2019, as Louisiana Counseling Association Day at the capitol.