All Bills - Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3083

Introduced
2/19/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Town Of Renova, Mississippi, For The Purpose Of Defraying Costs Associated With Defraying Costs Associated With The Isola Street Improvement Project From Payne Street To Mcknight Road For The Fiscal Year 2026.
MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3084

Introduced
2/19/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Town Of Renova, Mississippi, For The Purpose Of Defraying Costs Associated With The Second Street Improvement Project From Mcknight Road To The Terminus Of Second Street For The Fiscal Year 2026.
MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3085

Introduced
2/19/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Town Of Renova, Mississippi, For The Purpose Of Defraying Costs Associated With The Old Highway 61 Road Rehabilitation Project From Mcknight Road To Renova City Hall For The Fiscal Year 2026.
MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3086

Introduced
2/19/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Town Of Renova, Mississippi, For The Purpose Of Defraying Costs Associated With The Third Street Improvement Project From Mcknight Road To The Terminus Of Third Street For The Fiscal Year 2026.
MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3087

Introduced
2/19/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Town Of Renova, Mississippi, For The Purpose Of Defraying Costs Associated With The Tolliver Cove Improvement Project From Happy Street To The Terminus Of Third Street For The Fiscal Year 2026.
MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3088

Introduced
2/19/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Town Of Renova, Mississippi, For The Purpose Of Defraying Costs Associated With The Hill Circle Improvement Project From Mcknight Road To The Terminus Of Hill Circle For The Fiscal Year 2026.
MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3089

Introduced
2/19/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Town Of Renova, Mississippi, For The Purpose Of Defraying Costs Associated With The Daisy Street Improvement Project From Payne Street To Mcknight Road For The Fiscal Year 2026.
MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3090

Introduced
2/19/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Town Of Boyle, Mississippi, For The Purpose Of Defraying Costs Associated With The Memorial And Oakridge Sewer Extension Project For The Fiscal Year 2026.
MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3091

Introduced
2/19/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Town Of Boyle, Mississippi, For The Purpose Of Defraying Costs Associated With A 2025 Community Welcome Sign For The Fiscal Year 2026.
MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3092

Introduced
2/19/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
An Act Making An Appropriation To The City Of Indianola, Mississippi, For The Purpose Of Defraying Costs Associated With The Purchase Of A Fire Truck And Fire Safety Equipment For The Fiscal Year 2026.
MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3093

Introduced
2/19/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
An Act Making An Appropriation To The City Of Cleveland, Mississippi, For The Purpose Of Defraying Costs Associated With The Purchase And Equipment Of A Firetruck For The Fiscal Year 2026.
MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3094

Introduced
2/19/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
An Act Making An Appropriation To Bolivar County For The Purpose Of Defraying Costs Associated With The Old Highway 61 Rehabilitation Project From Green Road To State Highway 448 For The Fiscal Year 2026.
MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3095

Introduced
2/19/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
Engrossed
2/24/25  
Refer
2/25/25  
An Act To Amend Section 27-7-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reduce The Tax On All Taxable Income In Excess Of $10,000.00 To 3.75% For 2027, 3.5% For 2028, 3.25% For 2029, And 2.99% For 2030 And All Subsequent Years; To Amend Section 27-65-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Tax Retail Sales Of Groceries At 5% From And After July 1, 2025; To Amend Section 27-65-241, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Bring Forward Section 27-67-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Requires The Imposition Of A Use Tax, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; To Amend Sections 27-55-11, 27-55-519 And 27-55-521, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Excise Taxes On Gasoline And Certain Special Fuels To 21¢ Per Gallon From July 1, 2025, Through June 30, 2026, 24¢ Per Gallon From July 1, 2026, Through June 30, 2027, And 27¢ Per Gallon From July 1, 2027, Until The First Day Of The Month Immediately Following The Date Upon Which The Mississippi Transportation Commission And The State Treasurer Make Certain Certifications; To Provide For The Indexing Of Such Taxes; To Amend Sections 27-55-12 And 27-55-523, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Amend Sections 27-5-101 And 27-65-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Adjust The Distribution Of Revenue From Certain Gasoline And Special Fuel Taxes; To Revise The Distribution Of State Sales Tax Revenue Collected From Retail Sales Of Food For Human Consumption Not Purchased With Food Stamps But Which Would Be Exempt From Sales Tax If Purchased With Food Stamps; To Amend Section 27-67-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Adjust The Distribution Of Use Tax Revenue To Municipalities And Counties For Infrastructure; And For Related Purposes.
MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3096

Introduced
2/19/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
An Act Making An Appropriation Of Coronavirus State Fiscal Recovery Funds To Hinds County To Defray Expenses For The Improvement Of The Criminal Justice Facility's Water System For Fiscal Year 2026; And For Related Purposes.
MS

Mississippi 2025 Regular Session

Mississippi Senate Bill SB3097

Introduced
2/20/25  
Refer
2/20/25  
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Town Of Duncan, Mississippi, For The Purpose Of Defraying Costs Associated With The Town's 2024 Road Rehabilitation Project For The Fiscal Year 2026.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records