All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3492
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
Refer
3/28/25
Refer
3/28/25
The Act tells DOGAMI to study and report on risks related to toxic substances that may be released in an earthquake. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.6). Directs the State Department of Geology and Mineral Industries to study risks and issues relating to earthquake-induced [dispersion of hazardous materials] toxic inhalation. Requires the department to submit a report on the study to the State Resilience Officer by December 1, 2027. Provides that the study and report are confidential pending review by the Director of the Oregon Department of Emergency Management. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3493
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
This Act stops landlords of mobile and floating home parks from banning political campaigns from knocking on doors. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.6). Prohibits landlords from banning political canvassing or solitication in manufactured dwelling parks and marinas. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3494
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
The Act tells OHA to set minimum rates for reimbursing providers of mental health and SUD treatment. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.1). Requires the Oregon Health Authority to establish minimum reimbursement rates for behavioral health services provided to medical assistance recipients. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3495
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
The Act tells the TSPC to study merit-based pay for the workforce in the state education system. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.1). Requires the Teacher Standards and Practices Commission to study the implications and necessary changes of law to establish merit-based compensation for the workforce in kindergarten through post-secondary education in this state. Directs the commission to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to education no later than September 15, 2026.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3496
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
Refer
4/4/25
Refer
4/4/25
This Act makes the DLCD write guidance for siting child care facilities. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.7). Requires the Department of Land Conservation and Development to develop guidance for local governments on siting, and incentivizing the development of, child care facilities on or before December 31, 2026. Requires the department to publish the guidance and deliver a copy to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to land use or child care. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3497
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
Refer
4/7/25
Refer
4/7/25
The Act creates a task force to develop a comprehensive state plan on aging. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.7). Requires specified agencies to consider the effects of a proposed action on older adult populations. Establishes the Shared Future Oregon Task Force and specifies the task force's membership and duties. Sunsets the task force on January 2, 2027. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3498
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
The Act makes changes to which acts are "abuse" of a child. (Flesch Readability Score: 95.9). Modifies the definition of "abuse" for purposes of child abuse to remove the use of certain restraints on and seclusion of students. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3499
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
The Act would require that an urban renewal plan or an amendment to a plan be approved by voters. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.3). Requires the approval of an urban renewal plan by the electors of a municipality proposing a plan or a substantial amendment to a plan.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3500
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
The Act would bar city councillors from running for reelection before the last election held before the end of their current term. The Act would make an exception for a councillor who has moved from one district in the city to another. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.6). Provides that a city councillor may not seek reelection prior to the last election held before the expiration of the councillor's current term. Provides an exception if the city councillors are elected by district and the councillor has changed residence from one district to another. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3501
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
Refer
4/10/25
Refer
4/10/25
The Act is about changing aspects of certain water rights. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.7). Prohibits the consideration of whether certain changes related to water rights would impair or be detrimental to the public interest.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3502
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
The Act removes a sunset on provisions that relate to people who review water rights. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.8). Makes permanent certain provisions related to water right examiner certification.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3503
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
Refer
3/12/25
Refer
3/12/25
This Act makes OHCS give money to charity to turn Clackamas County homes into low-cost starter homes. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.1). Requires the Housing and Community Services Department to disburse moneys to Community LendingWorks to provide grants to purchase housing in Clackamas County that will be made available through a community land trust as affordable housing to first-time home buyers. Appropriates moneys for this program. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3504
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
Refer
3/20/25
Refer
3/20/25
The Act gives moneys to the TSPC to pay for new staff positions. (Flesch Readability Score: 83.0). Appropriates moneys to the Teacher Standards and Practices Commission to fund nine additional full-time staff positions to support student safety and adult accountability in the education system. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3505
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
Report Pass
3/13/25
Engrossed
3/20/25
Refer
3/20/25
The Act would bar an SDC for putting in a home fire sprinkler system that meets a certain national standard. The Act would bar an SDC for the increase in the capacity of the system's water meter over the water meter that would otherwise be required. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.1). [Digest: The Act tells OHCS to study housing. (Flesch Readability Score: 90.9).] [Requires the Housing and Community Services Department to study housing and to report to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to housing by September 15, 2026.] Provides that a local government may not impose or increase a system development charge for the installation of a National Fire Protection Association 13D residential fire sprinkler system or for the increase in capacity of the system's water meter over the capacity of the water meter that would otherwise be required.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3506
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/6/25
Refer
3/20/25
Refer
3/20/25
This Act transfers money from tax deferral account to OHA's Healthy Homes fund. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.4). [Digest: The Act tells OHCS to study housing. (Flesch Readability Score: 90.9).] [Requires the Housing and Community Services Department to study housing and to report to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to housing by September 15, 2026.] Transfers moneys from the Senior Property Tax Deferral Revolving Account to the Healthy Homes Repair Fund for the purpose of supporting seniors and individuals with disabilities.