All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session

OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3642

Introduced
2/20/25  
This Act allows landlords to end tenancies and raise rents without limit. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.7). Allows landlords to terminate month-to-month residential tenancies without cause. Repeals limits on increases to rent.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3643

Introduced
2/20/25  
Refer
2/21/25  
Report Pass
4/3/25  
Engrossed
4/10/25  
Creates a new state day to raise awareness of youth suicide. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.3). Designates October 9 of each year as Oregon Youth Suicide Awareness Day. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3644

Introduced
2/20/25  
Refer
2/21/25  
Refer
3/20/25  
This Act requires the OHCS to create a statewide shelter program. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Requires the Housing and Community Services Department to establish a statewide shelter program through which regional coordinators are selected to administer funding to shelter providers. Requires the department to adopt rules on or before January 1, 2026, and to select regional coordinators on or before May 1, 2026. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3645

Introduced
2/20/25  
The Act tells SFD to do a study on wildfires. (Flesch Readability Score: 95.1). Requires the State Forestry Department to study wildfires. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to forests not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3646

Introduced
2/20/25  
Refer
2/21/25  
Report Pass
4/11/25  
Engrossed
4/22/25  
Lets state agencies that buy goods or services prefer doing so from businesses owned by their employees. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.1). Adds entities in which employees of the entity own at least 50 percent of the ownership interest in the entity directly or through an employee stock ownership plan to the list of sources to which a contracting agency may give preference in procuring goods or services for public contracts. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3647

Introduced
2/20/25  
Tells gas station owners to display the prices they charge for fuel on a sign visible from the street and at each pump. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.4). Requires a person that operates a service station, business or other place for the purpose of retailing and delivering gasoline, diesel or other fuel to display on a sign visible from the street and on a sign visible at or near each dispensing device the prices charged for all grades of gasoline, diesel or other fuel.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3648

Introduced
2/20/25  
The Act directs the Department of State Police to study places where drugs can be destroyed. The Act takes effect on the 91st day after sine die. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.3). Directs the Department of State Police to study locations where controlled substances can be incinerated. Requires the department to provide the results of the study to the appropriate interim committees of the Legislative Assembly no later than September 1, 2026. Sunsets January 2, 2027. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3649

Introduced
2/20/25  
Refer
2/21/25  
Refer
4/11/25  
This Act makes DAS give a grant to a charity to support market rate housing via regional subgrants. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.6). [Digest: This Act makes HAPO give money to charities by region to enable the region to build homes. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.1).] Requires the [Housing Accountability and Production Office] Oregon Department of Administrative Services to provide [grants] a grant to a nonprofit by January 1, 2026, to provide up to five regional subgrants for regional housing coordination [by January 1, 2026]. Requires the [office] department to report on the [grants] grant to an interim committee of the Legislative Assembly related to housing on or before September 15, 2027. Appropriates moneys to the department [of Land Conservation and Development] out of the General Fund for [grants] the grant. Sunsets January 2, 2028. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3650

Introduced
2/20/25  
Refer
2/21/25  
Refer
4/8/25  
The Act creates the Latino Health System Task Force. (Flesch Readability Score: 84.9). Establishes the Latino Health System Task Force. Prescribes the task force's membership and duties. Directs the task force to report to the Legislative Assembly no later than December 15, 2026. Sunsets on December 31, 2026. [Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3651

Introduced
2/20/25  
The Act tells a person that plants certain types of turf grass in a field to register the field and make annual reports. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.8). Requires a person that plants turf type perennial ryegrass or turf type tall fescue in a field for sale as agricultural seed to register the field with, and make an annual report to, Oregon State University.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3652

Introduced
2/20/25  
Refer
2/21/25  
Refer
4/11/25  
The Act would make changes to laws with respect to school district collective bargaining. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.7). Expands the requirement to discuss class size and caseload as mandatory subjects of bargaining for purposes of school district collective bargaining. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3653

Introduced
2/20/25  
Refer
2/21/25  
Report Pass
4/14/25  
Engrossed
4/21/25  
Lets a state agency sign a contract to get energy savings and other benefits. Says that the state agency must obey certain rules, hire an approved company and get a guarantee of a certain level of savings. Takes effect on the 91st day after the session ends. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.3). Defines "energy performance contract" and allows authorized state agencies to enter into energy performance contracts without requiring a competitive procurement if the authorized state agency follows rules that the Attorney General adopts, negotiates a performance guarantee and enters into the contract with a qualified energy service company that the State Department of Energy prequalifies and approves. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3654

Introduced
2/20/25  
Refer
2/21/25  
Report Pass
4/11/25  
Engrossed
4/21/25  
The Act would set a maximum percent required for matching grants made by the state to small cities for capital projects. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.6). Sets maximum matching fund requirements for state grants to small incorporated cities for capital construction and municipal infrastructure. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3655

Introduced
2/20/25  
Refer
2/21/25  
Refer
4/4/25  
This Act tells the DEQ to make a program to test and certify wastewater lagoon operators. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.1). Directs the Department of Environmental Quality to develop a program for examination and certification of operators of lagoon wastewater treatment systems.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3656

Introduced
2/25/25  
The Act would make it so that elections for local option taxes must be held on the date of a general election in an even-numbered year. The Act would make an exception for certain measures to extend a current local option tax. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.6). Provides that elections on local option tax measures shall be held only on the date of general elections in even-numbered years, with one exception for certain measures seeking to extend current local option taxes. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records