All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session

OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3657

Introduced
2/25/25  
Refer
2/27/25  
Refer
4/1/25  
The Act tells an agency to create a pilot program related to damage caused by wildlife. The Act creates a fund for the pilot program. The Act gives money to the agency for the pilot program. (Flesch Readability Score: 74.8). Directs the State Department of Agriculture to establish a wildlife damage prevention and compensation pilot program. Establishes the Wildlife Damage Prevention and Compensation Fund in the State Treasury. Continuously appropriates moneys in the fund to the department for implementing the program. Sunsets the program and fund on January 2, 2030. Directs the department and the State Department of Fish and Wildlife to report on the program to committees or interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to natural resources on or before September 15, 2028. Appropriates moneys to the State Department of Agriculture for implementing the program. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3658

Introduced
2/25/25  
The Act changes when the court must appoint a lawyer for some people in matters involving children. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.1). Modifies provisions regarding the appointment of counsel for parents or children in juvenile dependency proceedings and contested adoption proceedings. Directs the court to appoint counsel for parents in juvenile dependency proceedings, including proceedings for termination of parental rights, only if facts found in the dependency proceeding may effect a criminal proceeding. Directs the court to appoint counsel for a child in a juvenile dependency proceeding only if the child was allegedly abused. Directs the court to appoint counsel for parents in contested adoption proceedings, including certain proceedings to determine parentage, only if facts found in the adoption proceeding may effect a criminal proceeding.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3659

Introduced
2/25/25  
The Act adds detail for methods of making estimates of how much tax money comes into General Fund. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.6). Prescribes methodology for the preparation of revenue estimates used in the budgeting process and as applicable to the surplus revenue refund process. Applies to estimates prepared on or after January 1, 2026. Requires the Department of Revenue to estimate the difference in surplus revenue calculations using stated methodologies, and transfer an amount equal to the difference for use for various purposes. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3660

Introduced
2/25/25  
This Act makes the DLCD study the development of housing. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.3). Requires the Department of Land Conservation and Development to study housing development and submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to housing no later than September 15, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3661

Introduced
2/25/25  
Makes ODOE do a study on power transmission and submit a report on its findings. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.8). Requires the State Department of Energy to study electrical transmission. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to energy not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3662

Introduced
2/25/25  
Makes ODOE do a study on clean energy and submit a report on its findings. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.5). Requires the State Department of Energy to study clean energy. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to energy not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3663

Introduced
2/25/25  
This Act makes the OHCS study rental housing. (Flesch Readability Score: 82.3). Requires the Housing and Community Services Department to study rental housing and submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to housing no later than September 15, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3664

Introduced
2/25/25  
The Act says that ODOT must study speed bumps. (Flesch Readability Score: 94.3). Requires the Department of Transportation to study the development of uniform standards for speed bump height and markings. Sunsets January 2, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3665

Introduced
2/25/25  
Directs ODE to study the state of education in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Requires the Department of Education to study the adequacy of education in the public schools of this state. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to education not later than September 15, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3666

Introduced
2/25/25  
Refer
2/27/25  
Refer
3/5/25  
Refer
3/5/25  
Refer
4/11/25  
Makes a power company apply to the PUC to show that the company carries out wildfire safety. Allows COUs to apply. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.2). Requires an electric public utility to apply for a wildfire safety certification. Allows a consumer-owned utility to apply for a wildfire safety certification. Directs the Public Utility Commission to issue a certification if the applicant has and implements, as applicable, a wildfire protection plan or wildfire mitigation plan and meets certain requirements. Establishes a statutory presumption that a utility that has been issued a wildfire safety certification is acting reasonably with regard to wildfire safety practices and materially consistent with the utility's wildfire protection plan or wildfire mitigation plan. Provides that a certification is valid for 12 months. Declares legislative findings with regard to human-caused wildfires and utilities.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3667

Introduced
2/25/25  
Directs ODE to study the state of education in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Requires the Department of Education to study the adequacy of education in the public schools of this state. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to education not later than September 15, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3668

Introduced
2/25/25  
Directs ODE to study the state of education in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Requires the Department of Education to study the adequacy of education in the public schools of this state. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to education not later than September 15, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3669

Introduced
2/25/25  
Refer
2/27/25  
Report Pass
4/15/25  
The Act changes the goals of a workforce development program. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.3). Expands the goals and purposes of the Prosperity 10,000 Program. Requires the Higher Education Coordinating Commission to [disburse funds appropriated for the purpose of administering the program to local workforce development boards within certain timelines] award grants to local workforce development boards to administer the program. Requires local workforce development boards to consider certain factors when distributing funds to certain entities.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3670

Introduced
2/25/25  
The Act is about diverting bodies of water near high-value farmland. The Act says that a company or state agency that diverts such a body of water has to do a study of impacts. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.6). Requires a company or state agency that diverts a body of water within 15 miles of high-value farmland to conduct a study to ensure that the diversion will not negatively impact the high-value farmland.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3671

Introduced
2/25/25  
The Act tells DHS to study ways to fund senior centers. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.3). Requires the Department of Human Services to study the ways to fund senior centers in Oregon. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to human services not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets January 2, 2027.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records