All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3732
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/27/25
The Act gives money to DOT to make an intersection safer. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the Department of Transportation for safety improvements at a specified intersection in Gladstone. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3733
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/27/25
The Act gives money to DAS to give to a nonprofit for a Head Start facility. (Flesch Readability Score: 74.2). Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the Oregon Department of Administrative Services for distribution to the Clackamas County Children's Commission for a Head Start facility. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3734
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/27/25
The Act pays OHCS to fund housing programs run by specific nonprofits. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.7). Appropriates moneys to the Housing and Community Services Department to distribute to specified organizations to continue housing and homelessness program services. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3735
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/27/25
The Act tells the OACO to hire permanent staff to carry out certain duties. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.7). Directs the Oregon Advocacy Commissions Office to hire permanent staff to convene affinity group task forces to develop recommendations on addressing health inequities.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3736
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/27/25
The Act tells DAS to look at more cost effective ways for agencies to get translation services and make a report. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.0). Requires the Oregon Department of Administrative Services to study more cost effective ways for state agencies to procure translation services. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to general government no later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3737
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/27/25
The Act adds a new estate tax exclusion of $4 million. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Allows an additional estate tax exclusion of $4 million. Adjusts for inflation. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3738
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/27/25
The Act makes a new tax subtraction for amounts received from retirement plans. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.4). Creates an Oregon personal income tax subtraction for amounts received from retirement plans. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026, and before January 1, 2032. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3739
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/27/25
The Act prohibits a person from removing a dam. The Act tells an agency to encourage persons to construct ten new dams. The Act tells the agency to compile lists of proposed dams and potential dams. (Flesch Readability Score: 70.1). Prohibits a person from removing a dam. Directs the Water Resources Department to encourage persons to construct 10 new dams in this state on or before December 31, 2030. Directs the department to compile lists of dams that have been proposed since the year 1900 and potential new dams. Directs the department to submit a report on the lists to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to natural resources not later than September 15, 2026. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3740
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/27/25
The Act tells school districts and certain private schools to designate sports by gender. The Act forbids males from playing in female sports. (Flesch Readability Score: 77.4). Requires school districts and certain private schools to designate athletic competitions and extracurricular sports according to biological sex. Prohibits biological males from participating in athletic competitions or extracurricular sports designated for biological females. Provides causes of action for students, school districts and private schools.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3741
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/27/25
The Act allows members-elect of the Senate and the House to hire office staff to begin the first day of the month in which the member takes the oath of office. (Flesch Readability Score: 66.7). Authorizes a member-elect of the Legislative Assembly to recruit and hire legislative assistants to begin work on the first day of the month in which the member-elect takes the oath of office. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3742
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/27/25
The Act lets members and staff with CHLs carry guns in the Capitol. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.5). Provides that members of the Legislative Assembly and legislative branch employees who have a valid concealed handgun license have an affirmative defense to a charge of possessing a firearm within the Capitol, and may not be arrested or charged for the offense while in possession of the license.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3743
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/27/25
Makes a radio tower have a backup power system that can provide power for two weeks. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.6). Requires a radio tower to have an emergency backup power system that can provide 14 days of backup power.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3744
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/27/25
Creates a task force to evaluate how school districts respond to reports of misconduct. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.7). Establishes the Task Force on Investigations of School Employee Misconduct. Prescribes the duties of the task force. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3745
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act provides that tax debt is canceled after 10 years. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.3). Provides for the cancellation, after 10 years, of uncollected tax debt, penalties and interest. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3746
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
Report Pass
4/15/25
Engrossed
4/23/25
Refer
4/23/25
For condos and homes in an HOA, this Act changes how construction defects and damages are handled. (Flesch Readability Score: 74.2). Reduces the statute of limitations for construction defect actions for units in a planned community or condominium. Imposes notice[, voting and approval] requirements before homeowners or condominium association owners may bring or join a construction defect action. Requires the declarant and board of directors of a condominium association to conduct [a semiannual] moisture [inspection] inspections. [Creates special procedural requirements for giving notice to contractors prior to filing construction defect claims if the action is brought by a homeowners association or association of unit owners. Extends the time for a sender of a secondary notice of defect to bring an action against the recipient of the secondary notice of defect.].