All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3882
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act says that ODOT must study ways to fund the transportation system in this state. The Act says ODOT must report to the JCT. (Flesch Readability Score: 82.4). Directs the Department of Transportation to study issues related to transportation funding and present the results of the study to the Joint Committee on Transportation. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3883
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
This Act makes public bodies provide for a period of public comment at the start of each meeting. (Flesch Readability Score: 66.3). Requires public meetings to include a time for public comments at the start of each public meeting.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3884
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act directs the Department of State Police to study firearm hold agreements. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.4). Requires the Department of State Police to study whether firearm hold agreements reduce firearm risks. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3885
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act says that ODOT must study highways in this state. The Act says ODOT must report to the JCT. (Flesch Readability Score: 90.9). Directs the Department of Transportation to study issues related to highways and present the results of the study to the Joint Committee on Transportation. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3886
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act modifies a defined term with respect to PECBA. The Act sets limits on the makeup of certain collective bargaining units. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.0). Modifies the definition of "supervisory employee" to exclude certain strike-prohibited public employees. Limits the permissible composition of certain bargaining units.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3887
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
This Act defines "work sessions" and makes public bodies provide for public comment at meetings where they will take a vote. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.6). Defines a "work session" for purposes of public meetings. Requires a governing body of a public body to include a time for public comment and requires notice of the public comment period if the body votes.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3888
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
This Act requires LCDC to adopt rules for siting homes for builders of solar energy plants. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.3). Requires the Land Conservation and Development Commission to, on or before June 30, 2026, adopt rules allowing temporary housing for the construction of solar power generation facilities. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3889
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act tells OHA to study mental health. (Flesch Readability Score: 82.3). Requires the Oregon Health Authority to study mental health. Directs the authority to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to health not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3890
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act would make police give notice to a landlord after responding to an incident at a rental unit. The Act would make police give a copy of any police report to the landlord. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.1). Requires a law enforcement agency to provide notice to a landlord after responding to an incident at a rental unit and to provide a copy of any police report to the landlord.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3891
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act tells OHA to study mental health. (Flesch Readability Score: 82.3). Requires the Oregon Health Authority to study behavioral health. Directs the authority to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to health not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3892
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act creates a task force to help adult learners go back to community college. (Flesch Readability Score: 73.1). Establishes the Task Force on Community College Adult Reconnect. Directs the task force to study and make recommendations related to assisting adult learners to overcome barriers to earning a degree or credential. Sunsets the task force on December 31, 2026. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3893
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act tells OHA to study health care. (Flesch Readability Score: 92.9). Requires the Oregon Health Authority to study health care. Directs the authority to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to health not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3894
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act says that the State Forester can lease forest lands for wind energy facilities. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.8). Allows the State Forester to lease forestlands for the purpose of siting energy facilities that use wind energy. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3895
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
Makes the PUC do a study on utilities and submit a report on its findings. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.5). Requires the Public Utility Commission to study utilities. Directs the commission to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to energy not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3896
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act tells DPSST to study public safety and make a report. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.7). Requires the Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to study public safety. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.