All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3897
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
Directs ODE to study the state of education in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Requires the Department of Education to study the adequacy of education in the public schools of this state. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to education not later than September 15, 2026.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3898
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act says ODOT must offer written CDL exam in English and Spanish. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.9). Requires the Department of Transportation to offer the written commercial driver examination in English and Spanish.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3899
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
Changes some of the laws that apply to the use of personal data of consumers. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.5). Lowers the thresholds above which, in applicable circumstances, controllers are subject to regulation in processing consumers' personal data. Prohibits controllers from processing sensitive data for the purposes of targeted advertising or profiling a consumer in furtherance of decisions that produce legal effects or effects of similar significance. Prohibits a controller from selling sensitive data for any reason.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3900
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act says a taxpayer must pay income tax on interest paid on a loan for a second or third or additional home. The Act says some taxpayers must pay income tax on some or all interest paid on loans for a principal home. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.1). Disallows, for purposes of personal income taxation, the mortgage interest deduction for a residence other than the taxpayer's principal residence, unless the taxpayer sells the residence or actively markets the residence for sale. Phases out the allowable deduction for the interest for a principal residence based upon income. Disallows a deduction for a principal residence above the threshold income amount. Establishes the Oregon Housing Opportunity Account. Transfers an amount equal to the estimated increase in revenue attributable to restrictions on the deduction of mortgage interest to the account. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3901
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act tells an agency to study rules related to water. The Act tells the agency to report on the study. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.2). Directs the Water Resources Department to study rules related to water. Directs the department to report to the committees or interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to natural resources no later than September 15, 2026.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3902
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
Refer
4/16/25
Refer
4/16/25
The Act directs the Oregon State Board of Nursing to form groups to study shortages in the field of nursing. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.0). Directs the Oregon State Board of Nursing to establish an advisory committee to study the nursing educator shortage and make recommendations to address the issues identified by the committee. Requires a report on the nursing education shortage to the board and to interim committees of the Legislative Assembly no later than March 15, 2026. Directs the board to dissolve the first advisory committee by March 31, 2026. Directs the board to then establish an advisory committee to study recruitment and retention challenges in the nursing workforce and make recommendations to address the issues identified by the committee. Requires a report on the nursing workforce to the board and to interim committees of the Legislative Assembly no later than December 15, 2026. Allows the board to enter into an agreement with a nonprofit organization to convene the advisory committees. Sunsets on June 2, 2027. [Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3903
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
This Act requires one parking spot per multiunit unit in urban areas. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). Requires local governments to require at least one parking space per multiunit unit with limited exceptions.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3904
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act tells OHCS to study housing. (Flesch Readability Score: 90.9). Requires the Housing and Community Services Department to study housing and to report to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to housing by September 15, 2026.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3905
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
Directs ODE to study state funding for public education in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). Requires the Department of Education to study the adequacy of state funding for public education in this state. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to education not later than September 15, 2026.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3906
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act allows a condemner to apply for land use approval. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.9). Allows a condemner to apply for a land use approval for lands subject to its power of condemnation.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3907
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act requires the Governor to appoint a U.S. Senator when a vacancy happens in the office. The Act states when the appointment ends and when a special election must occur. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.8). Requires the Governor to call a special election within a specified period after a vacancy in election or office of United States Senator occurs. Requires the Governor to appoint a United States Senator when a vacancy in the office occurs. Requires that the appointed Senator be of the same political party as the elected Senator who vacated the office. Requires the appointment to end when a replacement is elected.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3908
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/4/25
The Act increases the percentage of voters in the state required for a party to be a major party. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.8). Increases the party registration requirement to be a major political party in this state from five percent to 10 percent. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3909
Introduced
3/4/25
Refer
3/10/25
Enacts laws to increase school choice. (Flesch Readability Score: 87.9). Increases the limitation on the percentage of students in a school district who may enroll in a virtual public charter school that is not sponsored by the student's resident school district without first receiving approval from the school district. Requires school districts to participate in open enrollment. Establishes a waiver process. Directs the Department of Education to develop and implement a policy that provides for the establishment of education savings accounts for students to use for educational expenses. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3910
Introduced
3/6/25
Refer
3/10/25
Report Pass
4/15/25
Engrossed
4/23/25
Refer
4/23/25
The Act would let a water supply district act as a sanitary district in more cases. The Act would require a public hearing first. The Act would require written consent from the sanitary district or other current provider of the service in the district. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.2). [Digest: The Act would let a water supply district act as a sanitary district in more cases. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.6).] Expands the justifications for a domestic water supply district to exercise the powers of a sanitary district. Requires a public hearing on the exercise of the powers and written consent from any sanitary district or other provider of sanitary services within the district. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3911
Introduced
3/6/25
Refer
3/10/25
This Act gives money to DAS to give money to a city to build a wastewater treatment plant. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.0). Appropriates moneys to the Oregon Department of Administrative Services for the purpose of providing a grant to the City of Lakeside to construct a wastewater treatment facility. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.