All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1075
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
The Act tells a person to show certain forms to register to vote. The Act declares an emergency and becomes law when the Governor signs it. (Flesch Readability Score: 73.2). Requires evidence of United States citizenship for persons registering to vote in this state. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1076
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
Refer
4/16/25
Refer
4/16/25
The Act tells an agency to impose certain fees for licenses for animal rescue entities. The Act tells the agency to create a program for granting licenses to persons that breed certain animals. The Act gives money for the program. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.0). Directs the State Department of Agriculture to impose certain fees for licenses and license renewals for animal rescue entities. Modifies the definition of "animal rescue entity." Directs the department to adopt rules to establish a licensing program for breeders of certain animals. Punishes a violation of the rules by a maximum of six months' imprisonment, $2,500 fine, or both. Authorizes the department to investigate and inspect the breeders. Appropriates moneys to the department out of the General Fund for purposes related to the new licensing program. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1077
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
Tells PRAC to study public records. (Flesch Readability Score: 73.8). Requires the Public Records Advisory Council to study public records. Directs the council to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to public records not later than September 15, 2026.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1078
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
The Act says that a public servant commits official misconduct if they fail to report child abuse when they are required to do so. The Act also says that the state has extra time to bring an action against the public servant for the official misconduct. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.1). Specifies that a public servant's failure to make a mandatory report of suspected child abuse constitutes a crime of official misconduct in the second degree. Extends time period for commencing prosecution for official misconduct arising from the defendant's failure to make a mandatory report of suspected child abuse.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1079
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
This Act adds moneys to a housing fund. (Flesch Readability Score: 92.9). Appropriates moneys to the Housing Project Revolving Loan Fund.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB108
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
4/15/25
Refer
4/15/25
The Act changes the tax credit for crop gifts by raising the percentage of crop value allowed and extending the sunset. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.6). [Digest: The Act extends the sunset for the tax credit for crop donation. (Flesch Readability Score: 74.8).] [Extends the sunset for the income and corporate excise tax credit for crop donation.] Increases, for purposes of the income and corporate excise tax credit allowed for crop donation, the percentage of wholesale price allowed as amount of credit and extends the sunset. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2025. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1080
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
This Act prohibits local or agency bans of energy use. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.2). Prevents local governments or state agencies from prohibiting natural gas use or other energy options in or availability for new or existing residential or commercial buildings.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1081
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
The Act says that a taxpayer with income equal to or less than 120 percent of the state median income does not pay state income tax. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.0). Exempts from Oregon personal income taxation a taxpayer with Oregon adjusted gross income that is equal to or less than 120 percent of the median Oregon adjusted gross income. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026, and before January 1, 2032. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1082
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
The Act changes what information is on the sex offender website. The Act goes into effect when the Governor signs it. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.2). Directs the Department of State Police to release information about level two sex offenders on the website maintained by the department. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1083
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
The Act adds crimes to the sexually violent dangerous offender law. The Act goes into effect when the Governor signs it. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.2). Adds crimes of conviction that qualify for sexually violent dangerous offender sentencing, requiring lifetime post-prison supervision if the court makes certain findings. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1084
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
The Act makes a new tax on returns from investments of state universities. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.4). Imposes excise tax on net investment income of public universities. Directs revenues to Fund for Student Success. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1085
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
This Act reduces minimum lot sizes for farm and forest lands. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Quarters the minimum acreage for farm, forest and rangeland lots or parcels. Allows farm, forest or rangeland lots to be created from land without water rights if the land is subdivided to establish at least four dwellings that will share infrastructure and amenities. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1086
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
Report Pass
4/7/25
Engrossed
4/10/25
Refer
4/15/25
Tells DCBS to help a group of building officials to develop a plan to set up a program to train people to inspect buildings. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.6). [Digest: Tells the director of DCBS to set up an apprentice program to train people to inspect buildings. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.1).] Requires the Director of the Department of Consumer and Business Services to assist and provide support to the Oregon Building Officials Association to develop a proposal for [establish] establishing an apprenticeship program for building inspectors. Sunsets on January 2, 2027. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1087
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
The Act tells the PERB to study the salary of chaplains and make a report. The Act makes some groups of workers police officers for PERS. (Flesch Readability Score: 79.7). Directs the Public Employees Retirement Board to study the treatment of the salary of chaplains under the Public Employees Retirement System. Provides that certain members of the system qualify as police officers under the system.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1088
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
Tells state agencies to buy normal business software by means of an online portal. Allows the agencies to buy the software through their usual buying processes. Takes effect 91 days after the session ends. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.9). Requires contracting agencies to purchase common off-the-shelf software or other information technology products or services that do not require customization through an information technology marketplace portal. Authorizes the State Chief Information Officer to select and preapprove an information technology marketplace portal for use. Specifies features that the information technology marketplace portal must have. Exempts purchases through the information technology marketplace portal from the application of certain provisions of the Public Contracting Code. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.