All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1129
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/3/25
Report Pass
4/14/25
Engrossed
4/17/25
Refer
4/23/25
This Act requires LCDC to amend its rules relating to urban reserves. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). Requires the Land Conservation and Development Commission to amend its rules relating to urban reserves. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB113
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act clarifies the process for CPAs from out of state to become CPAs in Oregon. (Flesch Readability Score: 74.2). Specifies how a person who holds a certified public accountant license from out of state may obtain a certificate to act as a certified public accountant in Oregon.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1130
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/3/25
The Act makes changes to how the court awards parenting time. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.3). Prohibits the court from awarding more than 50 percent of parenting time to a noncustodial parent. Modifies remedies a court is permitted or required to impose when parenting time is not occurring as required by the parenting plan.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1131
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/3/25
This Act tells DAS to give a grant to the Chintimini Wildlife Center. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.5). Directs the Oregon Department of Administrative Services to award a grant to the Chintimini Wildlife Center. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1132
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/3/25
Tells one state agency to give moneys it gets from taxes on insurers to another state agency to help fight wild fires. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.4). Requires the Director of the Department of Consumer and Business Services to transfer the proceeds of certain taxes, fees, fines, penalties and other monetary obligations the director imposes upon out-of-state insurers and insurance producers to the State Forestry Department for deposit into the State Forestry Department Account. Requires the State Forester to use the proceeds to fund wildfire prevention and suppression.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1133
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/3/25
This Act lets counties allow the reuse of some rural buildings as second homes. (Flesch Readability Score: 77.8). Allows counties to approve the alteration, restoration or replacement of certain nonresidential structures on rural residential lands for use as an accessory dwelling unit.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1134
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/3/25
The Act makes a new tax subtraction for the cost of health insurance for a taxpayer's dependents. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.1). Creates an Oregon personal income tax subtraction for premiums paid for medical, dental or vision insurance coverage for a child dependent of the taxpayer. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026, and before January 1, 2032. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1135
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/3/25
The Act lets some counties tax marijuana that is grown in the county. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.5). Allows a qualifying county to adopt an ordinance to impose a tax on adult-use and medical marijuana production. Defines "qualifying county." Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1136
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/3/25
This Act makes LCDC adopt model rules for UGB amendments for small cities. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.9). Requires the Land Conservation and Development Commission to adopt model ordinances by which a city outside of Metro with a population of less than 25,000 may add lands to its urban growth boundary. Limits the bases for appeal of an ordinance adopted by a local government based on a model ordinance of the commission relating to housing or urbanization. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1137
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/3/25
Refer
4/15/25
Refer
4/15/25
This Act tells a health benefit plan to cover certain types of breast reconstruction services with certain rules. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.6). Requires health benefit plans to cover autologous breast reconstruction procedures and related services with specific requirements related to out-of-pocket costs, cost-sharing, utilization review, reimbursement rates and network adequacy.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1138
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/3/25
The Act would make new laws about a workforce standards board for some workers in the home and community-based services sector. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.6). Establishes the Home and Community-Based Services Workforce Standards Board. Prescribes the duties of the board. Directs the board to establish minimum working standards for the home and community-based services workforce. Requires the board to submit a written report to the Legislative Assembly regarding any adopted standard that is anticipated to impact the state budget. Provides that any such standard must be ratified by the Legislative Assembly before taking effect. Provides remedies for allegations of violations of the minimum standards established by the board. Requires the board to conduct a biennial comprehensive review, including a labor market analysis to inform the board's decisions to adopt new minimum standards or revise existing standards. Permits the board to establish uniform training standards for the home and community-based services workforce and to establish a process by rule for certifying worker organizations to provide the training to workers. Requires the board to submit a biennial report to the Governor and the Legislative Assembly summarizing the results of the comprehensive review and any actions taken by the board in the prior biennium.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1139
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/3/25
The Act makes changes to laws regarding noncompetes. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.2). Makes requirements for noncompetition agreements applicable to agreements regarding solicitation of employer's employees or customers. Provides an administrative remedy for employees alleging violation of requirements applicable to noncompetition agreements.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB114
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act would require a study of the property tax system in this state. A report will be submitted by September 15 of next year. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.3). Requires the Legislative Revenue Officer to study the property tax system in this state. Directs the officer to submit a report to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to revenue no later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1140
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/3/25
The Act makes laws about English-only rules in the workplace. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.7). Prohibits employers from imposing requirements that employees speak only English in the workplace unless the employer can demonstrate that the requirement is justified by business necessity and applicable only in limited circumstances. Requires employers to provide notice to employees.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB1141
Introduced
2/27/25
Refer
3/3/25
This Act allows short term rentals in resource housing but presumes that short term rentals may not be resumed as a nonconforming use. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.1). Allows the use of dwellings for vacation occupancy on lands zoned for farm or forest uses. Prohibits the resumption of a nonconforming vacation occupancy in counties except as allowed by county land use regulation.