All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session

OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB1197

Introduced
3/20/25  
Refer
3/20/25  
Refer
4/18/25  
The Act requires the state Medicaid program to provide respite care. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.9). [Digest: The Act tells OHA to create a respite care program for unpaid caregivers of children and youth with complex mental health needs. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.4).] Requires respite care services to be provided through the state medical assistance program to provide relief to [unpaid caregivers of individuals under the age of 26 who have complex mental health or substance use-related needs] children or youth under the age of 26 who have complex behavioral health needs or an intellectual or developmental disability and to the caregivers of such children or youth. Directs the Oregon Health Authority to seek any necessary federal approval. Becomes operative on the date that notice of federal approval is received. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB1198

Introduced
3/20/25  
The Act changes the law for the packaging of vapes to protect the health of minors. (Flesch Readability Score: 79.5). Makes it unlawful to distribute, sell or allow to be sold an inhalant delivery system that is packaged inconsistent with rules adopted by the Oregon Health Authority that are tailored judiciously to the specific purpose of protecting minors from the negative health effects of unlawfully using inhalant delivery systems. .
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB1199

Introduced
3/24/25  
This Act allows rural counties to rezone up to 50 acres for dense housing and provides grants for services. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.8). Allows counties with a population density of less than 10 people per square mile to rezone up to 50 acres to be divided and developed for residential dwellings of at least five units per acre. Requires the Oregon Business Development Department to provide grants to counties for infrastructure supporting these lands. Sunsets January 2, 2034.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB12

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act does not allow the SOS to mark certain judge candidates as incumbent. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.7). Prohibits the designation of incumbent for any candidate for specified judgeships who was appointed and is seeking election in the first election since that appointment.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB120

Introduced
1/13/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Refer
4/16/25  
The Act directs the LRO to study tax expenditures. (Flesch Readability Score: 66.1). Requires the Legislative Revenue Officer to study tax expenditures. Directs the Legislative Revenue Officer to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to revenue not later than December 1, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB1200

Introduced
3/27/25  
Gives the CCB the power to oversee people who get workers for companies that do construction work. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.1). Transfers regulatory authority over construction labor contractors from the Bureau of Labor and Industries to the Construction Contractors Board. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB1201

Introduced
3/27/25  
The Act would require a study of whether constructing bridges across the Columbia River west of the I-5 bridges would be feasible and useful. The Act would require a report of the study to be turned in next year to the JCT. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.9). Requires the Department of Transportation to study the feasibility and utility of constructing bridges across the Columbia River west of the Interstate 5 bridges. Directs the department to submit a report to the Joint Committee on Transportation no later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB1202

Introduced
3/31/25  
The Act creates a new agency to govern rail and transit in Oregon. The new agency name is the Oregon Rail and Transit Department. Transfers duties of governing rail from ODOT to the ORTD. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.9). Creates the Oregon Rail and Transit Department. Creates the State Rail and Transit Board. Transfers the duties and functions of the Department of Transportation relating to rail and public transit to the Oregon Rail and Transit Department. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB1203

Introduced
4/1/25  
This Act allows the siting of homes on golf courses on farm land. (Flesch Readability Score: 89.5). Allows the division of a portion of tracts used as golf courses on lands zoned for exclusive farm use for the purpose of siting single-unit or middle housing. Sunsets January 2, 2036. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB1204

Introduced
4/7/25  
This Act tells the DSL to make a pilot program for owners of land to restore salmon habitat. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.0). Directs the Department of State Lands, in consultation with the State Department of Fish and Wildlife, to develop a salmon credit pilot program to encourage the voluntary restoration of salmonid habitat in the Coquille and Coos watershed basins. Establishes the Salmon Credit Trust Fund. Directs the Department of State Lands and the State Department of Fish and Wildlife to consult with the United States Army Corps of Engineers to seek federal authorization for a bank instrument and activities that occur in navigable waters of the United States. Becomes operative on the date that the federal authorization and bank instrument are approved. Provides that the Department of State Lands may not approve a salmon credit project on or after January 2 of the sixth year following the federal authorization. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB1205

Introduced
4/8/25  
The Act extends the sunset for the tax subtraction for awards from wildfire lawsuits. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.7). Extends the sunset for the personal income tax subtraction for amounts received in resolution of a civil action arising from wildfire.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB1206

Introduced
4/9/25  
Tells DCBS to study funding to improve access to health care and report back. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.7). Requires the Department of Consumer and Business Services to study funding to improve access to health care. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to health care no later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB1207

Introduced
4/14/25  
The Act would give funds to a business group so that it may buy property to create a Black community cultural hub. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.2). Appropriates moneys for distribution to Soul District Business Association for the acquisition and redevelopment of property as the AfroEats Community Cultural Hub in Portland.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB1208

Introduced
4/23/25  
Declares a month in praise of plastics. (Flesch Readability Score: 90.9). Designates March of each year as Plastics Appreciation Month. Designates certain plastics and their uses to celebrate daily during March.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB1209

Introduced
5/1/25  
The Act says that a person may not file a special motion to strike a claim brought by a public body. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.7). Provides that a person may not file a special motion to strike a claim brought by a public body.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records