All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session

OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB350

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act finds that barred owls prey on spotted owls. The Act tells an agency to take actions to reduce the numbers of barred owls. The Act gives money for one of the actions. (Flesch Readability Score: 90.8). Finds that barred owls are known to prey on spotted owls. Instructs the State Fish and Wildlife Commission to issue an order authorizing the taking of barred owls and to establish a program rewarding the taking of barred owls. Appropriates moneys to the commission to fund the program rewarding the taking of barred owls. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB351

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act gives money for a program for taking certain fish. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.3). Appropriates moneys to the State Department of Fish and Wildlife for the purpose of funding programs that award $5 for each take of pikeminnow, if the take complies with wildlife laws. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB352

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act tells an agency to create a grant program to eradicate gorse. The Act creates a fund for the grant program. The Act gives money for the grant program. (Flesch Readability Score: 86.7). Directs the State Department of Agriculture to establish a grant program to facilitate the eradication of gorse for wildfire mitigation in southwest Oregon. Establishes the Southwest Oregon Gorse Wildfire Risk Reduction Fund to support the grant program. Appropriates moneys to the department for deposit into the fund. Sunsets the grant program and fund on January 2, 2030. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB353

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act gives money to the Wolf Management Compensation and Proactive Trust Fund. The Act says that the money must be used to move wolves that have preyed on livestock to certain counties. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.1). Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the State Department of Agriculture for deposit in the Wolf Management Compensation and Proactive Trust Fund. Provides that the moneys must be used for relocating wolves that have preyed on livestock to public lands in Hood River County, Multnomah County and Washington County. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB354

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act changes a program for voluntarily moving beavers. The Act makes the voluntary program include moving beavers from one part of this state to a different part of this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.1). Directs the State Department of Fish and Wildlife to include the relocation of beavers from western Oregon to central and eastern Oregon in a program for voluntarily relocating beavers.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB355

Introduced
1/13/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Refer
3/27/25  
The Act tells an agency to create a pilot grant program to promote the use of air curtains to manage wildfire risk. The Act gives money for the program. (Flesch Readability Score: 78.3). Directs the State Forestry Department to establish a pilot grant program to manage wildfire risk by promoting the use of air curtains by persons that make biochar. Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the department for funding the grant program. Sunsets the grant program on June 30, 2027. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB356

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act gives money to the Invasive Species Council. The Act describes how the money must be used. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.2). Appropriates moneys to the Invasive Species Council, out of the General Fund, for certain purposes. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB357

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act allows ports to charge for the costs of removing sediment. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.9). Authorizes ports to assess public bodies for a portion of the costs of removing sediment from port waters.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB358

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act would use some moneys raised by an existing tax to support state recreation areas on the Oregon coast. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.8). Establishes the Ocean Beach Fund. Directs that the moneys received from the state transient lodging tax in an amount equal to one percent of the tax collected at state recreation areas along the ocean shore be transferred to the fund. Directs the State Parks and Recreation Department to spend moneys from the fund for expenses of managing state recreation areas along the ocean shore. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB359

Introduced
1/13/25  
This Act says that any person can file a complaint for the DEQ to take action if homeless persons are putting waste into state waters. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.0). Authorizes any person to submit a complaint to the Department of Environmental Quality if the person reasonably believes that a camping site of homeless individuals is causing the discharge of wastes into state waters. Directs the department to remove individuals from the camping site and clean the camping site as necessary to protect state waters. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB36

Introduced
1/13/25  
Tells DCBS to study patient billing and report back. (Flesch Readability Score: 66.1). Requires the Department of Consumer and Business Services to study patient billing. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to health care not later than September 15, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB360

Introduced
1/13/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Report Pass
4/1/25  
Engrossed
4/3/25  
This Act allows some workers to apply pesticides without a license if they use a device that runs on a battery. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.6). Creates a pesticide licensing exemption for certain employees using a battery-powered device to apply pesticides. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB361

Introduced
1/13/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Refer
5/1/25  
The Act gives money to OBDD to give to ports for dredging projects. (Flesch Readability Score: 89.5). [Digest: The Act gives money to DAS to give to ports for dredging projects. (Flesch Readability Score: 89.5).] Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the [Oregon Department of Administrative Services] Oregon Business Development Department for distribution to specified ports to carry out dredging projects. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB362

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act tells an agency to study rules about water. The Act tells the agency to report on the study. (Flesch Readability Score: 74.0). Directs the Water Resources Department to study rules related to water. Directs the department to submit a report to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to natural resources not later than September 15, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB363

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act extends a grant program for places that process and sell meat products. The Act ends the grant program on January 2, 2028. The Act gives money for the grant program. (Flesch Readability Score: 77.0). Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the State Department of Agriculture to fund a grant program related to establishments that process and sell meat products. Extends the grant program. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records