All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB391
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act would set up a task force to study ways to prevent real property title fraud. The Act would require a report to be turned in next year. (Flesch Readability Score: 87.0). Creates the Task Force on Real Property Title Fraud Prevention to study methods for preventing title fraud upon transfers of real property. Sunsets on December 31, 2026. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB392
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act sets the date of certain elections to the first Tuesday in March of a year when a president is to be elected. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.6). Changes the date of certain elections in presidential election years from the third Tuesday in May to the first Tuesday in March.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB393
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
The Act tells ODEM to conduct a study on solar events. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Requires the Oregon Department of Emergency Management to study solar events. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to emergency management not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB394
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act says that moneys from the CAT tax go to PERS to pay down the UAL, instead of to the Fund for Student Success, for 10 years. (Flesch Readability Score: 78.7). Provides that, for 10 years, revenues from the corporate activity tax are transferred to the Public Employees Retirement Fund for payment of the unfunded actuarial liability of the Public Employees Retirement System, instead of to the Fund for Student Success.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB395
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act directs OBDD to create report on promoting use of hydrogen fuel in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 74.2). Directs the Oregon Business Development Department to prepare and submit a report on promoting hydrogen fuels in this state to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to energy not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB396
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Tells public colleges to create one form for admission to any public college in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.6). Requires public universities to establish a common application for undergraduate admission.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB397
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act changes laws with respect to employer time-clock rounding policies. The Act allows such practices to the extent they comply with federal law. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). Provides that laws regarding employee entitlements for recovery of unpaid wages and penalties do not apply to wages and penalties lost as a result of an employer's time-rounding policies that comply with federal rounding standards.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB398
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
This Act says that fees from programs to reduce greenhouse gas must go to the State Highway Fund. (Flesch Readability Score: 85.1). Requires state agencies that administer programs to reduce greenhouse gas emissions to deposit fees, assessments or other charges imposed pursuant to the program in the State Highway Fund. Directs the Governor to include in the Governor's budget an estimate of the amounts to be transferred in the coming biennium and recommendations for alternative revenue sources. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB399
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act requires DOR to make kicker refunds in the form of a check. (Flesch Readability Score: 89.8). Requires the Department of Revenue to make surplus revenue refunds, known as "kicker" refunds, in the form of a check. Applies to surplus revenue refunds issued for biennia beginning on or after July 1, 2025. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB4
Introduced
3/11/25
Refer
3/12/25
Makes an Internet service provider give a bill credit for any service outage that is more than one hour. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.8). Requires an Internet service provider to issue a prorated bill credit to a consumer for any service outage that lasts longer than one hour. Requires a provider to maintain records of all outages and bill credits for at least three years.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB40
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act would tell the Oregon Health Authority to study public health. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). Requires the Oregon Health Authority to study public health. Directs the authority to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to public health no later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB400
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
This Act exempts removal or fill projects from needing a DSL permit if they get a permit from the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.6). Exempts removal-fill projects from the requirement to obtain a permit from the Department of State Lands if the person is required to and does obtain a permit from the United States Army Corps of Engineers. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB401
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Sends more money to schools for students who are in poverty. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.3). Increases the weight allotted for children in poverty for purposes of State School Fund distributions. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB402
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells DSP to have a certain amount of troopers by 2036. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.4). Directs the Department of State Police to maintain a staffing level of at least 20 patrol troopers per 100,000 residents of this state, beginning on January 1, 2036.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB403
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act requires ballots that are returned by mail to be received by the date of the election. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.5). Requires that ballots that are returned by mail must be received by the date of the election.