All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB512
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
4/2/25
Refer
4/2/25
The Act tells an agency to study certain factors on fish released from the Rock Creek Hatchery, and to report on the study to the legislature. The Act gives money to the agency for the study. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.0). [Digest: The Act tells an agency to operate a fish hatchery at the Rock Creek Hatchery. The Act tells the agency to release the hatchery fish into a river. The Act gives money for those activities. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.4).] [Directs the State Fish and Wildlife Commission to operate a summer steelhead fish hatchery at the Rock Creek Hatchery and release the hatchery fish into the North Umpqua River.] Directs the State Department of Fish and Wildlife to study the impacts of temperature, predation and rearing practices associated with the Rock Creek Hatchery. Directs the department to report on the study to the Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2026. Appropriates moneys to the [commission] department out of the General Fund for [operating the hatchery and releasing the hatchery fish] conducting the study. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB513
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells ODFW to study protocols for stocking fish. (Flesch Readability Score: 78.2). Requires the State Department of Fish and Wildlife to study stocking protocols for salmon and other fish. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the environment not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB514
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells agencies to study how wildfire affects water quality. The Act tells the agencies to report on the study. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.2). Requires the State Department of Fish and Wildlife and Department of Environmental Quality to study the impacts of wildfire on water quality of streams and tributaries. Directs the departments to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to water not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB515
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
This Act gives money to the DAS to give to the Umpqua Fishery Enhancement Derby for projects on the Rogue River. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.6). Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the Oregon Department of Administrative Services for distribution to the Umpqua Fishery Enhancement Derby to facilitate salmonid habitat restoration projects. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB516
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act gives money to an agency for an inspection program. The program relates to small-scale meat processing and sales. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.5). Appropriates moneys to the State Department of Agriculture for purposes related to a program of state inspection for the processing and sale of meat products from nonamenable species. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB517
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
This Act lets counties keep proceeds of their land sales. (Flesch Readability Score: 95.1). Distributes the balance of the proceeds from county sales of real property to the county general fund.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB518
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act would have a county at high risk of financial distress hold back three percent of property taxes to be used to fund the work of the county assessor. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). Authorizes a county tax collector to withhold from property tax distributions to taxing districts within the county an amount equal to three percent of the distributions. Applies during any period in which the county is listed in an audit report of the Secretary of State as being at high risk of financial distress. Requires the county to use the withheld amounts to fund the office of the county assessor. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB519
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Exempts from state income tax for a veteran all retirement pay or pension received for service in the Armed Forces. The Act applies to tax years that start on or after January 1, 2026. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.1). Exempts from state income tax for a taxpayer who is a veteran all retirement pay or pension received for service in the Armed Forces of the United States. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB52
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
4/17/25
Refer
4/17/25
This Act tells LPRO to study affordable housing. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.2). [Digest: The Act tells OHCS to study housing. (Flesch Readability Score: 90.9).] Requires the [Housing and Community Services Department] Legislative Policy and Research Director to study affordable housing and to report to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to housing by [September] August 15, 2026.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB520
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
This Act gives money to Coos and Curry Counties to transport veterans to a VA medical center. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.1). Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the Oregon Department of Administrative Services for the biennium beginning July 1, 2025, to provide transportation services to the Roseburg Veterans Affairs Medical Center for veterans residing in Coos and Curry Counties.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB521
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
This Act makes more cities create urban reserves and allows building on them. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.5). Requires additional cities to develop urban reserves. Allows approval of certain types of development within urban reserves not designated by Metro and expansion of urban growth boundaries to include the development.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB522
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
This Act allows counties to allow bonus homes if the homes on farm or forest lands are concentrated. (Flesch Readability Score: 66.3). Authorizes counties to allow contiguous clustered nonresource dwellings on a clustered development tract in lieu of approval of individual nonresource dwellings on lands zoned for forest or farm use. Allows bonus dwellings when dwellings are sited on low value soil or with shared water or sewage systems. Establishes requirements for siting and approving dwellings and subdividing or partitioning clustered development tracts.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB523
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Allows a student to use certain services when the student is removed from an ASDP. (Flesch Readability Score: 73.1). Allows a student with a disability to use transitional services available to students without disabilities when the student's parent or foster parent revokes consent for, or objects to, the student's placement on an abbreviated school day program. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB524
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Excludes certain students from the ASDP laws. (Flesch Readability Score: 78.8). Excludes certain students from the requirements of an abbreviated school day program. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB525
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
This Act changes the laws for splitting land for homes in a city. (Flesch Readability Score: 89.5). Amends expedited land division criteria and processes.