All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB627
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act states that vehicles remain registered until the owner changes. (Flesch Readability Score: 75.5). Provides that vehicle registration for most vehicles will be ownership registration and owners must pay a one-time fee instead of a biennial fee. Preserves permanent registration for certain vehicles and proportional registration for other vehicles. Eliminates offenses related to failing to renew vehicle registration.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB628
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act says that a doctor or PA has to try to get informed consent from a patient to send the patient to the ER or to another doctor or PA. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.9). Requires a physician or physician associate to attempt to obtain a patient's informed consent for dismissal to seek emergency medical treatment or for transfer of care to another physician or physician associate.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB629
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act says that the OMB has to look at a reasonable person standard when it says what unprofessional conduct is. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.6). Requires the Oregon Medical Board to consider a reasonable person standard in determining what constitutes unprofessional conduct.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB63
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act imposes a flat rate income tax. (Flesch Readability Score: 66.1). Imposes personal income tax at flat rate if a taxpayer has an adjusted gross income below threshold amount. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB630
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Allows some students to receive money to pay for a nonpublic school. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.7). Establishes the Educational Scholarship Program for the purpose of assisting eligible students to pay for costs of attendance at certain nonpublic schools. Prescribes requirements of the program.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB631
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Tells school district boards to teach about how to put a stop to sex trafficking when teaching about how to put a stop to sexual abuse. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.8). Directs each school district board to adopt a child sexual abuse prevention instructional program that addresses sex trafficking of children. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB632
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Allows virtual public charter schools to receive a SIA grant. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.3). Allows virtual public charter schools to be eligible for grants distributed from the Student Investment Account. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB633
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Removes the cap of the percent of students who can attend a virtual public charter school. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.9). Removes the requirement that a student must receive approval from the student's resident school district before enrolling in a virtual public charter school that is not sponsored by the school district if a specified percentage of students in the school district already are enrolled in virtual public charter schools that are not sponsored by the school district. Removes the requirement that a school district that does not give approval for enrollment in a virtual public charter school not sponsored by the school district must provide information about other online options available to students. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB634
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Specifies that hydropower may be used to comply with an RPS. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.9). Specifies that electricity generated by a hydroelectric facility or other equipment that generates electricity through use of hydroelectric energy may be used to comply with a renewable portfolio standard. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB635
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
This Act tells OSU to study and make a report on nuclear energy. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.9). Directs Oregon State University to conduct a feasibility study on nuclear energy generation in this state. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB636
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act would require the Department of Transportation to study the creation of a road usage charge to ensure that electric and hybrid vehicles pay their fair share for the wear they cause to Oregon highways. The Act would require a report to be turned in next year. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.6). Requires the Department of Transportation to study the creation of a road usage charge to ensure that electric and hybrid motor vehicles pay their equitable share for the wear they cause to the highways in Oregon. Directs the department to submit a report of the study to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to transportation no later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB637
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
This Act says that fees from programs to reduce greenhouse gases from motor vehicle fuel must go to the State Highway Fund. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.1). Requires state agencies that administer programs to reduce greenhouse gas emissions from the combustion of motor vehicle fuel to deposit fees, assessments or other charges imposed pursuant to the program in the State Highway Fund. Directs the Governor to include in the Governor's budget an estimate of the amounts to be transferred in the coming biennium and recommendations for alternative revenue sources.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB638
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act says some persons may cut trees without following certain laws. The Act says that the laws apply again after the trees are cut. (Flesch Readability Score: 82.4). Provides that a small forestland owner that planted trees under reforestation requirements may harvest the trees. Specifies that reforestation requirements apply after the trees have been harvested. Allows the State Board of Forestry to adopt rules.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB639
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells the State Forester to manage state forests in a manner that keeps fuel load levels low. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.2). Requires the State Forester to actively manage state forestlands to achieve and maintain low forest fuel load levels.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB64
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
2/6/25
Engrossed
2/18/25
Refer
2/20/25
The Act tells ODHS to seek a waiver of certain federal SNAP requirements. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.4). Requires the Department of Human Services to seek a waiver of federal requirements in the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program in order to allow recipients of supplemental nutrition assistance to receive advance installment payments of the tax credit for dependent care expenses. Sunsets January 2, 2031. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.