All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session

OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB640

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act changes when minors are the victims of some crimes. (Flesch Readability Score: 87.9). Modifies the types of familial relationships involved in a manner of committing rape in the first degree and sodomy in the first degree. Adds a manner of committing unlawful sexual penetration in the first degree when there is a specified familial relationship between the defendant and the victim. Provides that sexual abuse in the second degree is a level eight offense on the sentencing guidelines when there is a specified familial relationship between the defendant and the victim. Increases the victim age below which assault and strangulation constitute felony offenses.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB641

Introduced
1/13/25  
This Act stops China or Chinese companies from getting farmland. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.3). Prohibits China or entities under the jurisdiction of China from buying or leasing farmlands. .
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB642

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act gives money to the State Police for rape kit testing. (Flesch Readability Score: 88.9). Appropriates moneys to the Department of State Police for the purpose of reducing the backlog of untested sexual assault forensic evidence kits.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB643

Introduced
1/13/25  
This Act allows landlords to end tenancies and raise rents without limit. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.7). Allows landlords to terminate month-to-month residential tenancies without cause. Repeals limits on increases to rent.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB644

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act tells a legislative group to audit the state food bank for political spending. The Act ends at the start of 2027. The Act starts when signed. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.5). Establishes the Oregon Food Bank Audit Committee as a joint committee of the Legislative Assembly. Directs the committee to cause an audit to be performed of Oregon Food Bank financial transactions occurring during a specified period, and to identify those transactions that directly or indirectly relate to political campaign activity or political issue activity. Directs the committee to report on audit findings to the Legislative Assembly on or before November 15, 2025. Requires the membership of the committee to consist of an equal number of majority party and minority party members from the Senate and an equal number of majority party and minority party members from the House of Representatives. Provides that a quorum of the committee consists of a majority of members from the House and a majority of members from the Senate. Sunsets January 2, 2027. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB645

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act would repeal the law that set a state standard for city and county laws that govern the use of public property by the homeless. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.3). Repeals the statute enacted by House Bill 3115 (2021) that established objective reasonableness as a statewide standard for city and county laws regulating the use of public property with respect to persons experiencing homelessness, as the basis for a cause of action for injunctive and declaratory relief to challenge such laws and as an affirmative defense in the prosecution of violations of such laws. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB646

Introduced
1/13/25  
Allows resident students of this state to attend any public school of this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.7). Allows a student who is a resident of this state to attend any public school of this state. Requires a student to receive consent from a district school board to attend the schools of the school district if the student is a nonresident student. Requires the district school board to give consent, with limited exceptions. Prohibits school districts from charging tuition or entering into contracts for admission of nonresident students. Removes the cap on the percentage of students from school districts who may attend certain virtual public charter schools.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB647

Introduced
1/13/25  
Increases the cap for students who want to attend a virtual public charter school. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.7). Increases to five percent the cap on the percentage of students from school districts who may attend certain virtual public charter schools without the approval of the school district.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB648

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act would match the estate tax exemption to the federal amount. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.7). Provides that, for the estates of decedents dying on or after January 1, 2026, Oregon estate tax is not due unless the value of the Oregon taxable estate exceeds $13.61 million. Raises the threshold for the filing of an estate tax return to a gross estate valued at more than $13.61 million. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB649

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act would repeal the estate tax. (Flesch Readability Score: 90.9). Provides that the Oregon estate tax is imposed only on the estates of decedents dying on or before January 1, 2025. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB65

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act lets a person whose civil rights have been violated by a person acting under the color of law sue for damages and other relief. The Act lets a plaintiff who wins this type of suit recover attorney fees. The Act lets a defendant who wins this type of suit recover attorney fees if the plaintiff's claim was frivolous. (Flesch Readability Score 62.7). Allows a person who has been deprived of rights, privileges or immunities secured by the Oregon Constitution or the laws of this state by a person acting under color of law to bring a civil action for economic and noneconomic damages and for injunctive or other equitable relief. Provides for the award of attorney fees and costs to a prevailing plaintiff, or to a prevailing defendant if the court finds that a plaintiff's claim was frivolous, unreasonable or without foundation.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB650

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act would grant a specially assessed property tax value for the homes of people who are at least 65 years old. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.1). Provides, for purposes of ad valorem property taxation, a specially assessed value for the owner-occupied primary residences of individuals who are at least 65 years of age. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB651

Introduced
1/13/25  
Tells the Secretary of State to study how to make it easier for a business to file papers in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.6). Requires the Secretary of State to study methods for reducing the paperwork filing burden on businesses in this state. Directs the Secretary of State to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to business not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB652

Introduced
1/13/25  
Allows districts and schools to hire people who are not teachers to teach reading. (Flesch Readability Score: 77.8). Allows a school district, an education service district or a public charter school to employ a person who is not licensed or registered with the Teacher Standards and Practices Commission to teach reading to students. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon Senate Bill SB653

Introduced
1/13/25  
Creates a task force to study the end of ODE. (Flesch Readability Score: 100.0). Establishes the Task Force to Abolish the Department of Education. Directs the task force to study and make recommendations related to the abolishment of the Department of Education. Sunsets the task force on January 2, 2027.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records