All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB708
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act directs the CJC to study rates of crime recidivism. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Requires the Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to study the effect of different types of sentences on rates of recidivism. Directs the commission to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB709
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act makes a new tax credit for apprenticeships. (Flesch Readability Score: 66.1). Creates income tax credit for taxpayers that provide apprenticeship opportunities. Applies to all tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB71
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells OED to study issues related to employment. A report will be submitted by September 15 of next year. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.2). Requires the Employment Department to study issues related to employment. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to business and labor not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB710
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
3/5/25
Engrossed
3/11/25
Refer
3/13/25
Report Pass
5/1/25
The Act says that the Chief Justice may require that state court judges meet certain ongoing learning requirements. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.6). [Digest: The Act tells OJD to study options for certain training programs for judges. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.9).] [Requires the Judicial Department to study options for domestic and sexual violence training for judges. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026.] [Sunsets on January 2, 2027.] Modifies the enumerated authority of the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court to include the authority to establish continuing education requirements for state court judges. Directs the State Court Administrator to create continuing education opportunities for judges to meet the requirements established by the Chief Justice. Requires the State Court Administrator to submit a report on the implementation of the judicial continuing education requirements to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB711
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Makes changes to the highway worker photo radar laws. (Flesch Readability Score: 66.1). Makes changes to the highway worker photo radar laws.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB712
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act would increase the maximum value of property for each tax year by three percent. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.9). Provides for an annual increase of three percent in the maximum assessed value of property. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB713
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act would issue lottery bonds to fund levee projects. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.7). Authorizes the issuance of lottery bonds for deposit in the Levee Project Grant Fund. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB714
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act would let lottery bonds be sold to fund flood safety projects on certain parts of the Columbia. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.8). Authorizes the issuance of lottery bonds to fund Columbia corridor flood safety projects in Multnomah County.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB715
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act creates a high speed rail task force. Tells the task force to study, research and make reports about high speed rail in Oregon. (Flesch Readability Score: 88.9). Creates the Cascadia High Speed Rail Task Force. Specifies the membership of the task force. Directs the task force to submit progress reports and a final report. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB716
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
4/15/25
Refer
4/15/25
Makes health insurers and OHA pay more for services at some urgent care centers than other urgent care centers until 2033. Tells DCBS to make some rules and submit a report about this Act. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.1). [Digest: Tells OHA to make rules about registering urgent care centers and creates some standards. Tells some insurers to cover cost of care at registered urgent care centers at a set rate. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.5).] [Requires the Oregon Health Authority to adopt rules for registering urgent care centers and specifies requirements.] [Requires coverage of services provided by registered urgent care centers by health insurance that reimburses medical costs, plans offered by the Public Employees' Benefit Board and Oregon Educators Benefit Board, health maintenance organizations and multiple employer welfare arrangements and establishes requirements for rates of reimbursement.] [Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Requires a policy or certificate of health insurance to reimburse medical care provided at an eligible urgent care center in an amount that is 20 percent higher for the same services when the services are provided at an urgent care center that is not eligible. Includes this coverage requirement for the state medical assistance program, Oregon Educators Benefit Board, Public Employees' Benefit Board, health care services contractors and trusts carrying out multiple employer welfare arrangements. Requires the Department of Consumer and Business Services to makes rules and submit a report on the implementation of this Act. Sunsets the coverage requirements for eligible urgent care centers on January 2, 2033.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB717
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
4/7/25
Refer
4/7/25
The Act directs HECC to create a pilot program that gives money to student teachers. The Act sunsets on January 2, 2028. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.0). Directs the Higher Education Coordinating Commission to establish a pilot program to provide stipends for student teachers and the educators who mentor student teachers for licensure. Sunsets on January 2, 2028.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB718
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
3/6/25
Refer
3/6/25
The Act would create the Parkinson's disease registry. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.2). Establishes the Parkinson's disease registry. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB719
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells DOJ to look at starting graffiti courts. (Flesch Readability Score: 86.7). Requires the Department of Justice to study graffiti courts. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB72
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Tells a state agency to study insurance to protect things people own. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). Requires the Department of Consumer and Business Services to study property insurance. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to insurance not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon Senate Bill SB720
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
3/12/25
Refer
3/12/25
The Act provides money to DAS to distribute to POIC to construct a workforce center. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.5). Appropriates moneys to the Oregon Department of Administrative Services for distribution to the Portland Opportunities Industrialization Center to construct and operate the Sunrise Campus Cultural Workforce Center. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.