All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2592
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
This Act makes it a crime to intentionally release a balloon into the airspace of this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.1). Adds intentionally releasing a balloon into the airspace of this state as conduct punishable as the crime of offensive littering. Punishes by a maximum of 30 days' imprisonment, a $1,250 fine, or both.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2593
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
4/14/25
Refer
4/14/25
The Act changes the name of a state program that helps people pay for child care. The Act tells an agency to bring people together to study and create a plan related to the program. (Flesch Readability Score: 75.4). [Digest: The Act tells the Department of Early Learning and Care to study the impact of a waitlist to receive child care on some families. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.6).] [Requires the Department of Early Learning and Care to study the impact on student parents and working parents of the waitlist to participate in the Employment Related Day Care subsidy program.] [Directs the department to submit a report to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to child care no later than September 15, 2026.] Renames the Employment Related Day Care subsidy program. Directs the Department of Early Learning and Care to convene stakeholders to study and develop recommendations to remove families from the Employment Related Day Care subsidy program wait-list. Requires the department to submit a report on the recommendations to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to early childhood no later than September 30, 2026.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2594
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
4/7/25
Engrossed
4/14/25
Refer
4/14/25
The Act says that a dental laboratory has to register with the HLO. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.4). Requires a dental laboratory to register with the Health Licensing Office. Defines "dental laboratory." Requires a dental laboratory to provide a material content disclosure to a dentist who prescribes a work order for a dental prosthetic appliance or other artificial material or device. Defines "material content disclosure." Allows the office to impose discipline for certain violations. Directs the office to provide administrative and regulatory oversight to the dental laboratory program. Becomes operative July 1, 2026. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2595
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act creates a system to track Parkinson's disease in Oregon. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.9). Establishes Parkinson's disease registry.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2596
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
2/17/25
Engrossed
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
Causes this state to join a compact for school psychologists. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.7). Enacts the School Psychologist Interstate Licensure Compact. Prescribes that the purpose of the Compact is to facilitate the interstate practice of school psychology in educational or school settings. Describes the rights and responsibilities under the Compact.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2597
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
4/14/25
Refer
4/14/25
The Act tells OHA to increase the rate at which dental care organizations are reimbursed. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.8). Directs the Oregon Health Authority and coordinated care organizations to reimburse dental care organizations for dental services provided to medical assistance recipients at a rate no less than 59.8 percent of the average rate paid by insurers nationwide. Directs the authority to annually review and revise the rates. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2598
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act makes clear that a light rail car or monorail are not commercial motor vehicles. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.9). Clarifies that a rail fixed guideway system is not a commercial motor vehicle for the purposes of the Oregon Vehicle Code.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2599
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Tells PDAB to make a plan about uniform drug pricing and report back. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.5). Requires the Prescription Drug Affordability Board to make recommendations to the Legislative Assembly regarding aligning prescription drug price transparency. Sunsets on January 2, 2027. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2600
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells the State Court Administrator to look at evidence and make a report. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.5). Requires the State Court Administrator to study evidence and submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2601
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells the CJC to do a study. (Flesch Readability Score: 100.0). Directs the Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to study ways to improve the expunction process, and to provide the results of the study to the appropriate interim committees of the Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2026. Sunsets January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2602
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act directs OJD to study ways to improve the process for setting aside convictions. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.8). Requires the Judicial Department to study ways to improve the efficiency of the process for setting aside convictions. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2603
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act directs OJD to study ways to improve the process for setting aside convictions. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.8). Requires the Judicial Department to study ways to improve the efficiency of the process for setting aside convictions. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2604
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act directs the OJD to study options to make family law court cases simpler in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 70.1). Requires the Judicial Department to study options for simplifying family law proceedings in this state. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2605
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells the State Court Administrator to look at fees and make a report. (Flesch Readability Score: 78.8). Requires the State Court Administrator to study fees and submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2606
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act directs the Department of State Police to study background checks for gun transfers. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.5). Requires the Department of State Police to study the efficiency of firearm transfer criminal background checks. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.