All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2607
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Tells a state agency to study insurance and submit a report on what it finds. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.5). Requires the Department of Consumer and Business Services to study insurance. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to insurance not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2608
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells the State Court Administrator to look at juries and make a report. (Flesch Readability Score: 73.1). Requires the State Court Administrator to study juries and submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2609
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells OYA to study juveniles. (Flesch Readability Score: 66.7). Requires the Oregon Youth Authority to study the demographics of juveniles in the juvenile justice system in this state. Directs the authority to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to human services not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2610
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells DPSST to look at public safety officers and make a report. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.7). Requires the Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to study public safety officers. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2611
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells the State Court Administrator to look at lawsuits and make a report. (Flesch Readability Score: 73.1). Requires the State Court Administrator to study lawsuits and submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2612
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Tells a state agency to study liens. (Flesch Readability Score: 78.8). Requires the Department of Consumer and Business Services to study liens. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to indebtedness not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2613
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
4/1/25
Engrossed
4/8/25
Refer
4/8/25
The Act tells the court what factors to look at when deciding whether a child is in immediate danger. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.3). [Digest: The Act directs DHS to study how to improve services provided to victims of child abuse in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.3).] [Requires the Department of Human Services to study how to improve services provided to victims of child abuse in this state. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to human services not later than September 15, 2026.] [Sunsets on January 2, 2027.] Prescribes the factors that the court must consider when determining whether a child is in immediate danger for the purpose of granting a request for a temporary order providing for the custody of, or parenting time with, the child.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2614
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
4/15/25
Engrossed
4/23/25
Refer
4/23/25
The Act makes various changes to the OPDC. The Act takes effect when the Governor signs it. (Flesch Readability Score: 92.9). [Digest: The Act tells the OPDC to do a study. (Flesch Readability Score: 100.0).] [Directs the Oregon Public Defense Commission to study ways to improve the provision of public defense services within this state, and to provide the results of the study to the appropriate interim committees of the Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2026.] [Sunsets January 2, 2027.] Directs the Oregon Public Defense Commission to submit an agency request budget to the Oregon Department of Administrative Services after approval by commission members. Modifies the requirements for policies concerning compensation and caseloads. Removes the authority of the commission to advocate for or against legislation. Modifies the authority of the Governor, beginning July 1, 2027, over the appointment and removal of the executive director of the commission and the removal of commission members. Extends the authority of the commission to contract with entities that subcontract with other entities or persons for the provision of public defense services until July 1, 2033. Specifies requirements for subcontracting entities. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2615
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act directs OYA to study how to improve how the authority serves youth in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 70.1). Requires the Oregon Youth Authority to conduct a study regarding options for improving how the authority provides services to youth in this state. Directs the authority to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to human services not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2616
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells the CJC to do a study. (Flesch Readability Score: 100.0). Directs the Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to study recidivism rates of persons granted a pardon and to provide the results of the study to the appropriate interim committees of the Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2026. Sunsets January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2617
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act directs the DOJ to do a study. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.3). Directs the Department of Justice to study possible modifications to post-conviction relief proceeding procedures to increase efficiency, and provide the results of the study to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2026. Sunsets January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2618
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells the CJC to do a study. (Flesch Readability Score: 100.0). Directs the Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to study the use of technology in improving the efficiency of pretrial proceedings, and to provide the results of the study to the appropriate interim committees of the Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2026. Sunsets January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2619
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Tells OJD to study privacy and report back. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.3). Requires the Judicial Department to study privacy. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary no later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2620
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act directs the OJD to study options to make probate proceedings simpler in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.5). Requires the Judicial Department to study options for simplifying probate proceedings in this state. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2621
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act directs the OJD to study options to make protective proceedings simpler in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.8). Requires the Judicial Department to study options for simplifying protective proceedings in this state. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.