All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2757
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells ODHS to study the workloads of APD case managers. (Flesch Readability Score: 81.8). Requires the Department of Human Services to study the workloads of case managers in the aging and disability services division of the department. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to human services not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2758
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells an agency to designate tourism districts in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.7). Directs the Oregon Tourism Commission to identify, designate and monitor tourism districts in this state. Allows a tourism district to apply to the commission for assistance in obtaining grants from the Oregon Business Development Department for community development and from the Department of Transportation for community transit investments. Allows a tourism district to request assistance from the commission in applying for and obtaining temporary waivers of land use and building code requirements and regulations of public entities. Authorizes the commission to identify and designate tourism and recreation activity that is a live performance as a priority tourism and recreation activity that is not subject to the crime of unlawful recording of a live performance.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2759
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act makes an office in OJD to do audits in circuit courts and report bad behavior. (Flesch Readability Score: 70.1). Establishes the Office of Quality Assurance as an independent office within the Judicial Department. Directs the office to conduct audits of noncriminal proceedings in the circuit courts and report incidents of judicial bias or egregious behavior to the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court and the Commission on Judicial Fitness and Disability.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2760
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells ODEM to pay back disaster response groups for their costs related to volunteers. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.6). Directs the Oregon Department of Emergency Management to develop and implement a program to reimburse certain nongovernmental entities for specified costs related to volunteers. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2761
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells ODEM to give grants to counties to hire staff to manage disasters. (Flesch Readability Score: 78.8). Directs the Oregon Department of Emergency Management to develop and implement a program to provide grants to counties to create and fill county-level disaster mitigation and recovery manager positions. Specifies the duties of a disaster mitigation and recovery manager. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2762
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act says it is an offense to sleep in danger zone near the road. (Flesch Readability Score: 95.4). Creates the offense of sleeping in a highway danger zone. Punishes by a maximum fine of $250.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2763
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act creates a fund to help people after emergencies. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.7). Establishes the Oregon Individual Assistance Grant Account as an account in the Oregon Disaster Response Fund. Continuously appropriates the moneys in the account to the Oregon Department of Emergency Management for assistance to individuals and households following emergencies.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2764
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act creates a work group to make a multi-sector plan for aging. (Flesch Readability Score: 83.0). Directs the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives to appoint a work group to develop a framework for a multi-sector plan for aging to be administered by the Department of Human Services. Specifies the membership and duties of the work group. Requires the work group to submit three reports to the committees and interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to human services, by December 1, 2025, during the 2026 regular session of the Legislative Assembly and by July 1, 2026, respectively. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2765
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
This Act tells DEQ to create a grant program to prevent fuel spills. (Flesch Readability Score: 96.0). Directs the Department of Environmental Quality to develop and maintain a grant program to prevent spills at fuel facilities. Establishes the Fuel Spills Mitigation Fund.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2766
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act gets rid of the law saying that a justice court may not become a court of record if the court is within 50 miles of the circuit court for the county in which the court is located. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.9). Removes the provision stating that a justice court may not become a court of record if the court is located within 50 driving miles of the circuit court for the county in which the justice court is located.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2767
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act gives money to DLCD to make plans related to natural hazards. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.4). Appropriates moneys to the Department of Land Conservation and Development for natural hazards mitigation planning. Declares the intent of the Legislative Assembly that the appropriated moneys be used to secure federal funding for natural hazards mitigation planning. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2768
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells ODEM to contract with one or more persons to help acquire and use resources for emergencies. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.3). Directs the Oregon Department of Emergency Management to contract with one or more philanthropic liaisons. Specifies the minimum duties of philanthropic liaisons. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2769
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells OBDD to give info about emergencies to small businesses. The Act tells OBDD to run a program to give grants to small businesses to prepare for emergencies. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.8). Directs the Oregon Business Development Department to develop a registry of small businesses interested in receiving communications relating to emergency management. Directs the department to use the registry to communicate information relating to emergency management to small businesses. Directs the department to develop and implement a program to provide grants and assistance to small businesses to strengthen emergency resilience. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2770
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act creates a body to direct the state's response after an emergency. The Act lets the Governor hire more people to do work during the emergency. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.5). Establishes the Oregon Disaster Recovery Authority. Provides that the Governor may activate the authority when declaring a state of emergency. Directs the authority, when activated, to coordinate initial crisis services, coordinate recovery and mitigation efforts and coordinate the provision of emergency aid to local governments or private entities. Authorizes the Governor, when the authority is activated, to hire additional state agency personnel to perform duties related to the emergency.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2771
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act removes the law that stops a county from making a justice of the peace district that includes parts of some cities. (Flesch Readability Score: 73.1). Removes provisions prohibiting a county court or board of county commissioners from establishing a justice of the peace district that includes the county seat or city in which a circuit court regularly holds court.