All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session

OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2772

Introduced
1/13/25  
This Act gives money to counties and OPB for the emergency alert system. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.4). Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the Oregon Military Department for distribution to counties for the purpose of acquiring analog encoders for transmission of information to broadcasters in case of an emergency. Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the department for distribution to Oregon Public Broadcasting for the purpose of upgrading, repairing or replacing elements of its signal distribution system. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2773

Introduced
1/13/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Refer
4/15/25  
The Act tells an agency to create a program for fishing in certain areas. The Act ends the program on January 2, 2033. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.7). [Digest: The Act tells an agency to create a program for fishing in certain areas. The Act ends the program on January 2, 2028. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.7).] Directs the State Department of Fish and Wildlife to establish a program to award grants for recreational fishing facilities within an urban growth boundary. Authorizes the use of lottery bond net proceeds to fund the grants. Sunsets the program on January 2, [2028] 2033. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2774

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act prohibits a parent from being left alone with a child if the parent commits certain acts with a gun. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.7). Directs the court to prohibit unsupervised parenting time with a parent who committed abuse if the abuse involved certain acts with a firearm.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2775

Introduced
1/13/25  
Tells a state agency to see if it is possible to get discounts on home loans for putting in renewable energy systems. Shows examples of the kinds of systems the agency should look into. Tells the agency to report back its findings to the legislature. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.0). Requires the Department of Consumer and Business Services to study the feasibility of providing discounted mortgage loans to home buyers who install energy generation improvements capable of providing electricity to a local utility. Directs the department to submit findings to interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to energy resources not later than September 15, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2776

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act tells ODEM to do a study on its operations. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Directs the Oregon Department of Emergency Management to study and make recommendations regarding improvements to the operations of the department. Requires the department to submit a report on its findings by January 1, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2777

Introduced
1/13/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Refer
4/1/25  
This Act makes some changes to the mining laws. (Flesch Readability Score: 94.3). Exempts from the requirement to obtain an onshore exploration permit wells from which sample materials are acquired, if the well is constructed by a licensed well constructor. Provides that the State Department of Geology and Mineral Industries may not impose additional conditions on the transfer of an operating permit. Provides that the department or other permitting agency may not require a land use compatibility statement for activities already authorized by a local jurisdiction.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2778

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act tells an agency to study innovative water technologies. The Act tells the agency to report on the study. The Act gives money for the study. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.9). Directs the Water Resources Department to study innovative water technologies. Directs the department to submit a report to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to natural resources not later than September 15, 2026. Appropriates moneys out of the General Fund to the department for the purpose of undertaking the study. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2779

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act says that members of the Legislative Assembly may not serve on juries. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.7). Provides that members of the Legislative Assembly may not serve on juries.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2780

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act says that a person with a CHL is qualified to get a gun purchase permit. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.0). Provides that a person is automatically qualified to obtain a permit to purchase a firearm if the person holds a valid concealed handgun license.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2781

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act makes changes to laws about home loans and lender collateral. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.7). Provides that a court may not stay or prohibit a Federal Home Loan Bank from exercising rights to collateral pledged by an insurer-member that is subject to a delinquency proceeding. Requires a receiver to comply with provisions of this Act with respect to claims against the insurer-member. Requires a Federal Home Loan Bank that exercises a right to collateral to repurchase any outstanding capital stock that exceeds the amount of Federal Home Loan Bank stock that the insurer-member must hold as a minimum investment, subject to certain determinations. Prohibits a receiver from voiding the transfer of, or obligation to transfer, moneys or property under the terms of a Federal Home Loan Bank security agreement. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2782

Introduced
1/13/25  
Tells the Secretary of State to study voting. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.2). Requires the Secretary of State to study elections. Directs the secretary to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to elections not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2783

Introduced
1/13/25  
This Act requires DOJ to study squatting. (Flesch Readability Score: 78.8). Requires the Department of Justice to study squatting and submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to housing no later than September 15, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2784

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act tells DPSST to look at training police on deflection and make a report. (Flesch Readability Score: 73.1). Requires the Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to study incorporating deflection training into the training required of police officers. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2785

Introduced
1/13/25  
This Act changes some fees charged by DOGAMI and tells DOGAMI to give a report on mined land to the legislature each year. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.7). Modifies certain fees charged by the State Department of Geology and Mineral Industries. Requires the department to annually report on the mined land regulatory and reclamation program.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB2786

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act makes laws about unused sick leave and vacation leave payouts. (Flesch Readability Score: 74.8). Requires employers who provide sick leave, vacation leave or personal business leave benefits to employees to compensate employees for all earned but unused accrued leave when employment terminates.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records