All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2907
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
3/3/25
Refer
3/3/25
The Act makes a new tax credit for food banks and community gardens. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.5). Creates an income tax credit for investment in community gardens and food banks. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2025. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2908
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Allows a school district or a public charter school to decide how a student shows civics knowledge. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.1). Allows a school district or a public charter school to require a student to demonstrate proficiency in civics by a method other than completion of a civics course.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2909
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act creates the OPUHSC as part of the ODEM. (Flesch Readability Score: 95.1). Establishes the Oregon Public Utility Homeland Security Commission within the Oregon Department of Emergency Management. Establishes the Oregon Public Utility Homeland Security Fund. Establishes a grant program for the purpose of providing financial assistance to consumer-owned utilities for developing projects associated with natural disaster mitigation, prevention, response and recovery. Authorizes the issuance of lottery bonds to finance projects associated with natural disaster mitigation, prevention, response and recovery.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2910
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act would change some laws related to energy and property taxes. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). Authorizes local governments to adopt additional criteria to encourage energy efficiency and energy generation on property granted certain exemptions from ad valorem property taxation. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2911
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act makes a new tax credit for sick leave paid by employers. (Flesch Readability Score: 89.5). Creates an income tax credit for certain employers that are required to provide paid sick leave. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026, and before January 1, 2030. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2912
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Requires a teacher of a course that is part of a dual credit program to take graduate level course work for the course. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.8). Establishes minimum education requirements for high school teachers of dual credit courses. Takes effect July 1, 2026.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2913
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act makes a new tax credit for donations that aid veterans. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Creates an income tax credit for a member of a military organization that contributes financial resources to the Veterans' Educational Aid Account prior to the organization's dissolution. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026, and before January 1, 2032. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2914
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
This Act creates a task force to study how to make pipelines and associated storage units secure. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.1). Establishes the Task Force on Secure Pipelines and Associated Storage Units and Terminals. Directs the task force to study matters related to safe transportation, storage and transference of petroleum, natural gas and other flammable substances through pipelines, in associated storage units and at associated terminals. Directs the task force to submit a report to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to emergency preparedness no later than December 15, 2026. Sunsets December 31, 2026. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2915
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
3/25/25
Engrossed
3/31/25
Refer
3/31/25
Report Pass
4/28/25
The Act lets some health records be sent to PSRB without the person's permission when a person is released to DOC. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.6). Allows disclosure without authorization of written accounts containing individually identifiable health information to the Psychiatric Security Review Board for an individual who is under the jurisdiction of the board and conditionally released to the Department of Corrections.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2916
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
2/17/25
Engrossed
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
The Act changes the needs for the fire instructor on the Fire Policy Committee. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.8). Modifies the qualifications of the fire instructor representative member of the Fire Policy Committee of the Board on Public Safety Standards and Training.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2917
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells OHA to study how coverage will be determined for the Oregon Health Plan. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.6). Requires the Oregon Health Authority to study potential changes to the prioritized list of health services compiled by the Health Evidence Review Commission under ORS 414.690. Directs the authority to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to health not later than September 15, 2026.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2918
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Requires a hospital to report on a quarterly basis to the OHA its daily cash on hand. Allows the OHA to impose penalties for failure to comply with the law. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.8). Requires a hospital to report on a quarterly basis to the Oregon Health Authority its daily cash on hand. Allows the authority to impose penalties for failure to comply with the law.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2919
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Makes a hospital report on an annual basis to the OHA certain data on stock assets. Allows the OHA to impose penalties for failure to comply with the law. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.8). Requires a hospital to report on an annual basis to the Oregon Health Authority the percentage of medical assistance program payments and the amount of other public funds that were invested in stocks. Allows the authority to impose penalties for failure to comply with the law.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2920
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Makes a hospital give to the OHA and make public on a website certain fiscal data. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.6). Requires a hospital to report to the Oregon Health Authority and make publicly available securities data and disclosures that the hospital provides to the federal Municipal Securities Rulemaking Board.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2921
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
This Act makes changes to how some redemption centers may be sited and approved. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.7). Modifies provisions related to the siting and approval of full-service redemption centers. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.