All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2982
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
3/24/25
Refer
3/24/25
The Act increases some boat fees. The money raised will be put into a fund to prevent and control plants and animals that do not belong in the waters of this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 79.5). Increases boating fees and deposits moneys into the Aquatic Invasive Species Prevention Fund. Provides that a waterway access permit is required while operating a nonmotorized boat of any length. Creates exceptions.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2983
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells ODHS to study the transition of certain youth to adult homes and facilities. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.6). Requires the Department of Human Services to study the transition of individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities from youth residential settings to adult residential settings. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to human services no later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2984
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
The Act gives money to an agency for deposit into a certain fund. The Act says that the money must be used for activities related to water. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.6). Appropriates moneys to the State Department of Fish and Wildlife out of the General Fund for deposit into the Oregon Conservation and Recreation Fund. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2985
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
4/15/25
Refer
4/15/25
The Act changes the laws about how the PUC conducts proceedings. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Modifies provisions relating to the administrative proceedings of the Public Utility Commission.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2986
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells irrigation districts that if a user requests less water for a season, the user's district must comply with the request. The Act says that the district may send the extra water to other users. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.5). Provides that an irrigation district that receives a request from a user for delivery of a lower rate or duty of water during an irrigation season may not deliver to the user a higher rate or duty of water during the irrigation season than was requested. Creates an exception. Provides that the irrigation district may temporarily transfer the use of the water.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2987
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells DAS to do a study on compensation. (Flesch Readability Score: 78.2). Requires the Oregon Department of Administrative Services to study compensation for members of state boards and commissions. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to rules not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2988
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
4/10/25
Refer
4/10/25
The Act tells an agency to do certain things related to aquifers. The Act tells the agency to make a report related to aquifers. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). Instructs the Water Resources Department to take certain actions related to aquifer recharge and aquifer storage and recovery. Instructs the department to report to interim committees of the Legislative Assembly on topics related to aquifer recharge and aquifer storage and recovery on or before [October 1, 2026] January 1, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2989
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act directs OHA to pay, in some cases, for a person's medical care out of the LEMLA if the person was injured by a peace officer. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.3). Requires the Oregon Health Authority to pay out of the Law Enforcement Medical Liability Account any copayment or other cost-sharing amounts owed by an individual for the cost of medical services, or the entire cost of the medical services if an individual is a medical assistance recipient or uninsured, for injuries related to law enforcement activity. Authorizes the authority to make the final determination of whether injuries are injuries related to law enforcement activity. Directs the authority to conduct outreach about the availability of funding and the process for submitting claims for reimbursement.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2990
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells ODOT to give a report on how they are changing the written test for Class C driver licenses. They must send this report to the JCT by September 15, 2026. The law will start 91 days after the legislature finishes its session. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.6). Requires the Department of Transportation to provide a report on the progress of revising the written test for Class C driver licenses. Directs the department to submit the report to the Joint Committee on Transportation not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2991
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
4/7/25
Refer
4/7/25
The Act gives moneys to an agency to fund help for low-income people with their taxes. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.9). Appropriates moneys to be used for funding outreach regarding federal earned income tax credits and other tax benefits and to provide tax navigation and preparation to low-income individuals. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2992
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
4/10/25
Refer
4/10/25
Directs OHA to have a program to provide eye exams and glasses to certain students. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.8). [Digest: Directs ODE and OHA to have a program to provide eye exams and glasses to certain students. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.1).] Directs [the Department of Education and the Oregon Health Authority to jointly] the Oregon Health Authority, in collaboration with the Department of Education and the Oregon Board of Optometry, to establish and implement a program that provides eye examinations, [and] prescription eyeglasses and related services to students from low-income families. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2993
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells the OMB and OSBN to offer classes and forms to help health care providers communicate with their patients. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.6). Directs the Oregon Medical Board and Oregon State Board of Nursing to offer language education to health care providers regulated by the boards and make available patient forms in languages patients can comfortably communicate.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2994
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells OHA to create a position designed to promote health equity. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.4). Directs the Oregon Health Authority to establish a medical science liaison position to develop recommendations for advancing health equity and justice. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2995
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
4/11/25
Refer
4/11/25
Sets up a task force to look at ways in which the state can give reparations for past acts of racism to African-American people who live in the state. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). Establishes the Task Force on Reparations and directs the task force to study and develop proposals for financial and nonfinancial reparations for Oregonians of African-American descent, develop appropriate methods for educating the public about the task force's findings and recommend appropriate remedies based on the task force's findings. Sunsets December 31, 2026. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB2996
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells DHS that it cannot find that a parent has neglected a child based solely on the parent's financial resources. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.2). Prohibits the Department of Human Services from substantiating allegations of child neglect based solely on the financial resources of the child's parent or guardian.