All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session

OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3057

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act tells DHS to create an adoption awareness program. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.3). Directs the Department of Human Services to establish the Adoption Awareness Program to be administered by a nonprofit organization or agency.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3058

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act tells courts to make a finding when committing a person to the state hospital for fitness to proceed. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.0). Directs a court to make a finding on dangerousness when committing a person who lacks fitness to proceed to a state mental hospital.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3059

Introduced
1/13/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Refer
3/3/25  
Refer
3/3/25  
Refer
4/11/25  
Directs ODE to study the needs of youth who are in a residential training home and who attend a public school in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.6). [Digest: Directs DHS and ODE to jointly study the needs of youth who are in a residential facility and who attend a public school in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.0).] Requires [the Department of Human Services and] the Department of Education, in collaboration with the Department of Human Services, to [jointly] study the needs of youth who are in a residential [facility] training home and who attend a public school in this state. Directs the [departments] Department of Education to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to human services and education no later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3060

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act makes Oregon join a compact with other states to let physician assistants from other states work in this state. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.6). Enacts the PA Licensure Compact. Allows the Oregon Medical Board to disclose specified information to the PA Licensure Compact Commission. Exempts individuals authorized to provide medical services by compact privilege from certain requirements. Allows the board to use moneys to meet financial obligations imposed on the State of Oregon as a result of participation in the Compact. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3061

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act tells the TSPC to study opportunities to hire a person to work in a school even if the person has been convicted of some crimes. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.3). Requires the Teacher Standards and Practices Commission to study opportunities to modernize the background check process and criminal history standards that apply to people seeking employment in public schools. Directs the commission to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to education no later than September 15, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3062

Introduced
1/13/25  
This Act makes new factories study and reduce harms to sensitive people. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). Requires local governments to map sensitive uses as part of a comprehensive plan. Requires, before allowing the development of industrial uses, study and mitigation of impacts on nearby sensitive uses and an additional public hearing. Requires local governments to map sensitive uses by January 1, 2027. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3063

Introduced
1/13/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Report Pass
3/14/25  
Engrossed
3/20/25  
Refer
3/20/25  
Considers a student who is in a hospital program to be enrolled in the student's school district. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.1). Provides that a student who is in a hospital educational program shall continue to remain enrolled in the school district in which the student had been a resident prior to being in the hospital educational program only for the purpose of maintaining access to classroom curricula and associated technology.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3064

Introduced
1/13/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Refer
3/4/25  
Tells some health insurers, OEBB and PEBB to cover care for menopause symptoms. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.9). Requires certain health insurers, the Oregon Educators Benefit Board and the Public Employees' Benefit Board to cover treatment for perimenopause, menopause and postmenopause.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3065

Introduced
1/13/25  
This Act makes cities adopt local rental standards, which may include rent control. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.4). Requires each city with a population of less than 200,000 to establish local standards to promote housing stability no later than July 1, 2027. Allows adoption of rent control through local standards adopted under this Act or by cities with a population of 200,000 or greater. Requires review of local standards at least every 10 years. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3066

Introduced
1/13/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Refer
2/24/25  
Refer
2/24/25  
Refer
3/24/25  
The Act gives money to the DOC for a program for adults in custody. (Flesch Readability Score: 77.8). Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the Department of Corrections for purpose of funding the advanced esthetics program at the Coffee Creek Correctional Facility. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3067

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act directs the CJC to study repealing the sunset of the JRP. The Act directs the CJC to provide the results of the study to the legislature by May 1, 2026. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.6). Directs the Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to study repealing the sunset of the Justice Reinvestment Program. Requires the commission to provide the results of the study to the appropriate interim committees of the Legislative Assembly no later than May 1, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3068

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act would tell the DOC to study community corrections. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.3). Requires the Department of Corrections to study community corrections. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3069

Introduced
1/13/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Refer
4/7/25  
The Act tells DPSST to study public safety and make a report. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.7). Requires the Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to study public safety. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3070

Introduced
1/13/25  
Refer
1/17/25  
Refer
2/19/25  
The Act gives money to DOJ for the Sexual Assault Task Force for SANE certification. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.5). Appropriates moneys to the Department of Justice to fund the management of the Oregon SAE/SANE Certification Commission by the Attorney General's Sexual Assault Task Force.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3071

Introduced
1/13/25  
The Act tells DOJ to look at crime victim services and make a report. (Flesch Readability Score: 89.8). Requires the Department of Justice to study crime victim services. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records