All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3117
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells an agency to study ways to fund responses to natural disasters. The Act tells the agency to report on the study. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.2). Directs the State Forestry Department to study funding for preventing, responding to and recovering from natural disasters. Directs the department to report on the study to the committees or interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to natural resources no later than September 15, 2026.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3118
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
4/9/25
Refer
4/9/25
The Act would tell DOC to make some voice communications services free for persons in custody. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.6). [Digest: The Act would tell DOC to give persons in custody access to some communication services for free. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.1).] Requires the Department of Corrections to enter into a contract, or renegotiate an existing contract, with a third party to provide voice communications services at no cost to persons confined at a Department of Corrections institution. Prohibits the receipt of financial or in-kind compensation by the department for providing voice communications services to persons in custody. Directs the department to submit a progress report on the implementation of the Act to the Legislative Assembly by February 1, 2026, and a biennial report on certain data to the Legislative Assembly no later than September 15 of each even-numbered year.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3119
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
This Act tells DEQ to wait to enforce some California rules on truck exhaust. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.7). Prohibits the Department of Environmental Quality from implementing or enforcing the Advanced Clean Trucks regulations before January 1, 2027. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3120
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act modifies the earned income tax credit and extends the sunset for the credit. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.5). Increases the percentage of federal earned income credit allowable as a credit against Oregon personal income tax. Provides an additional percentage tier based upon the age of the youngest dependent of the taxpayer. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026, and before January 1, 2032. Extends the sunset for the earned income tax credit. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3121
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
3/11/25
Refer
3/11/25
The Act would result in support for small and very small water systems. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.5). Directs the Oregon Department of Administrative Services to [enter into a contract with] distribute moneys to the Oregon Association of Water Utilities to provide technical assistance, or enter into a contract with a third party to provide technical assistance, to address the needs and vulnerabilities of small and very small community water systems, construct and equip a water utility training center and employ three staff to provide related support and resources. Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the department to carry out the [contract] Act. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3122
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act would tell the SPRD to work to enter an agreement with federal partners to create an access fee on a road in eastern Oregon. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.0). Directs the State Parks and Recreation Department to exercise good-faith efforts to enter into an agreement with the United States Department of the Interior's Bureau of Reclamation and Bureau of Land Management to establish and implement an access fee for use of Owyhee Lake Road. Provides for certain minimum terms of the agreement.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3123
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells ODA to start a program to give grants to help reduce the risk and impact of wildfires in rangeland areas of the state. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.8). Directs the State Department of Agriculture to establish a wildfire risk and impact reduction initiative program that awards grants to eligible local stakeholders.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3124
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells an agency to identify areas with drought impacts. The Act tells the agency to reduce predators in the areas. The Act gives money for purposes related to the areas. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.1). Instructs the State Department of Fish and Wildlife to identify certain areas as wildlife management units or herd ranges and undertake predator control in the wildlife management units or herd ranges until certain criteria are met. Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the department for predator control. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3125
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act creates a task force related to rangeland wildfire. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.7). Establishes the Task Force on Rangeland Wildfire Resilience and Risk Reduction. Sunsets the task force on December 31, 2026. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3126
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act tells the TSPC to create a pilot program to license some types of teachers. (Flesch Readability Score: 79.8). Directs the Teacher Standards and Practices Commission to establish by rule a five-year pilot program to license teachers other than career and technical education teachers in this state in a manner similar to the career and technical education teaching license program. Sunsets on January 2, 2031.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3127
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Report Pass
2/24/25
Engrossed
3/6/25
Refer
3/6/25
The Act would tell people to report deaths to the state using an electronic system. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.5). [Digest: The Act would tell people with medical jobs to report deaths to the state using an electronic system. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.6).] Requires [medical certifiers and medical examiners to] use of the state electronic reporting system to report deaths to the Center for Health Statistics.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3128
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
The Act says that a person does not need to get a permit in order to store surface water to prepare for responding to fire. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.7). Provides that the storage of surface water for fire response preparedness does not require a water right application, permit or certificate.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3129
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
3/20/25
Refer
3/20/25
The Act creates a behavioral health workforce fund for higher learning. The Act provides for the purposes and uses of moneys in the fund. Declares an emergency and becomes law when the Governor signs it. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.4). Establishes the Higher Education Behavioral Health Workforce Expansion Fund. Directs the Higher Education Coordinating Commission to distribute moneys from the fund to community colleges and public and private universities in this state for purposes of expanding the training, employment and retention of behavioral health professionals. Appropriates moneys to the fund. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3130
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Provides that a school board member does not have to file an SEI if the member does not receive a stipend from the school district. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.5). Requires a member of a district school board to file an economic interest statement only if the member receives a stipend from the district school board.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3131
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/17/25
Refer
2/13/25
Refer
2/13/25
The Act gives money to a state agency for uses related to working lands. The Act goes into effect when the Governor signs it. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.2). Appropriates moneys to the Oregon Watershed Enhancement Board, out of the General Fund, for deposit in the Oregon Agricultural Heritage Fund. Establishes a maximum limit for payment of expenses by the board from the Oregon Agricultural Heritage Fund. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.