All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session

OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3342

Introduced
1/28/25  
Refer
1/30/25  
Report Pass
4/15/25  
Engrossed
4/23/25  
The Act changes laws related to the regulation of water rights in this state. The Act goes into effect 91 days after sine die. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.2). [Digest: The Act tells an agency to study rules about water. The Act tells the agency to report on the study. (Flesch Readability Score: 74.0).] [Directs the Water Resources Department to study rules related to water. Directs the department to submit a report to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to natural resources not later than September 15, 2026.] Modifies provisions of law related to the regulation and administration of water rights in this state. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3343

Introduced
1/28/25  
This Act tells the State Department of Fish and Wildlife to study natural resources. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.7). Requires the State Department of Fish and Wildlife to study natural resources. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to natural resources no later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3344

Introduced
1/28/25  
The Act would let a cemetery opt to use the total return distribution method to fund its care. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.6). Authorizes a cemetery authority to elect to use the total return distribution method to fund endowment care of the cemetery.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3345

Introduced
1/28/25  
The Act says that taxis and rideshare vehicles must have plates that have red letters and numbers. (Flesch Readability Score: 70.1). Requires taxis and rideshare vehicles to have rideshare plates that have cherry red lettering and numbering. Creates the offense of failure to display rideshare plates. Punishes by a maximum fine of $250.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3346

Introduced
1/28/25  
Refer
1/30/25  
Refer
4/2/25  
This Act makes DLCD study land use for energy siting in areas short on ground water. (Flesch Readability Score: 68.9). Requires the Department of Land Conservation and Development, in consultation with the Department of Revenue, State Department of Energy and Water Resources Department, to study siting of energy facilities in designated critical ground water areas east of the Cascade Range. Directs the [department to submit] Department of Land Conservation and Development to summarize findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to land use not later than [September 15] November 30, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3347

Introduced
1/28/25  
Refer
1/30/25  
Refer
3/27/25  
The Act makes changes to some laws about family support payments. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.9). Directs the Department of Justice to disburse to certain obligees payments of support that have been assigned to the state beginning January 1, 2027. Directs the Department of Human Services to disregard certain child and spousal support paid to the family beginning January 1, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3348

Introduced
1/28/25  
Refer
1/30/25  
Report Pass
4/1/25  
Engrossed
4/9/25  
The Act makes changes to laws about the child support program. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.3). Modifies provisions of law regarding child support program administration.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3349

Introduced
1/28/25  
Refer
1/30/25  
Refer
4/4/25  
The Act allows an agency to take certain actions related to items used for fighting fires. The Act makes changes related to groups that fight fires in certain rural areas. The Act creates a new fund for providing moneys and items to groups. (Flesch Readability Score: 70.8). Authorizes the State Forestry Department to take certain actions related to motor vehicles and other equipment used by the department. Instructs and authorizes the department to take certain actions related to rangeland protection associations. Establishes the Rangeland Protection Association Fund. Makes certain changes related to the authority of the State Forester to assist rangeland protection associations. Authorizes the State Forester and forest protection associations to acquire or dispose of goods, services or equipment for the prevention, mitigation or suppression of fire on forestland. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3350

Introduced
1/28/25  
Refer
1/30/25  
Refer
4/4/25  
The Act gives moneys to an agency for deposit in a new fund related to groups that fight fires in certain rural areas. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.1). Appropriates moneys out of the General Fund to the State Forestry Department for deposit in the Rangeland Protection Association Fund. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3351

Introduced
1/28/25  
The Act makes Oregon join a compact to let counselors from other states work in Oregon. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.6). Enacts the interstate Counseling Compact. Allows the Oregon Board of Licensed Professional Counselors and Therapists to disclose specified information to the Counseling Compact Commission. Exempts individuals authorized to work as professional counselors under the Compact privilege to practice from the requirement to obtain a license from the board. Allows the board to use moneys to meet financial obligations imposed on the State of Oregon as a result of participation in the Compact. Becomes operative on January 1, 2028. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3352

Introduced
1/28/25  
This Act tells the DSL to make a pilot program for owners of land to restore salmon habitat. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.0). Directs the Department of State Lands, in consultation with the State Department of Fish and Wildlife, to develop a salmon credit pilot program to encourage the voluntary restoration of salmonid habitat in the Coquille and Coos watershed basins. Establishes the Salmon Credit Trust Fund. Directs the Department of State Lands and the State Department of Fish and Wildlife to consult with the United States Army Corps of Engineers to develop or identify an existing programmatic general permit to authorize restoration activities under the pilot program. Becomes operative on the date that a programmatic general permit is established. Provides that the Department of State Lands may not approve a salmon credit project on or after January 2 of the sixth year following the establishment of a programmatic general permit. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3353

Introduced
1/28/25  
The Act tells agencies to study how wildfire affects water quality. The Act tells the agencies to report on the study. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.2). Requires the State Department of Fish and Wildlife and Department of Environmental Quality to study the impacts of wildfire on water quality of streams and tributaries. Directs the departments to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to water not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets January 2, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3354

Introduced
1/28/25  
This Act lets counties keep proceeds of their land sales. (Flesch Readability Score: 95.1). Distributes the balance of the proceeds from county sales of real property to the county general fund.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3355

Introduced
1/28/25  
The Act tells ODFW to study protocols for stocking fish. (Flesch Readability Score: 78.2). Requires the State Department of Fish and Wildlife to study stocking protocols for salmon and other fish. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the environment not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3356

Introduced
1/28/25  
The Act gives money to DAS to support a meal program for seniors. (Flesch Readability Score: 76.5). Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the Oregon Department of Administrative Services for distribution to South Coast Business Employment Corporation to provide meal services to elderly individuals. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records