All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3417
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
The Act directs the CJC to study rates of crime recidivism. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Requires the Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to study the effect of different types of sentences on rates of recidivism. Directs the commission to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3418
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
The Act would require a study of economic development in this state with a report to be turned in next year. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.6). Requires the Oregon Business Development Department to study economic development in Oregon. Directs the department to submit a report of the study to the Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2026.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3419
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
The Act tells an agency to study rules related to water. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.9). Directs the Water Resources Department to study rules related to water. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to water not later than September 15, 2026.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3420
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
Transfers money from the State School Fund for use on TAG education. (Flesch Readability Score: 74.8). Requires the Department of Education to transfer from the State School Fund to the Talented and Gifted Education Account an amount that equals one percent of the total amount available to school districts as general purpose grants. Establishes the Talented and Gifted Education Account. Prescribes the distribution of the account. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3421
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
This Act tells some health insurers and OHP to cover biomarker testing with some rules. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.5). Requires certain policies and certificates of health insurance and medical assistance managed plans to cover biomarker testing with certain rules and requirements.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3422
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
Adds to the standards that must be met for EFSC to take an exception to a planning goal for a proposed energy facility. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.1). Adds a criterion to the standards that the Energy Facility Siting Council must find for the council to take an exception to an applicable statewide planning goal for a proposed energy facility. Applies to exceptions taken on or after the effective date of this Act. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3423
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
Says than an insurer may not look at some information about a person to set a rate for car insurance for that person. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.1). Directs an insurer to consider only specified information in determining rates for a motor vehicle liability insurance policy. Prohibits an insurer from considering other specified information in determining eligibility, rates or premiums for a motor vehicle liability insurance policy. Permits an insurer, under specified circumstances, to consider an abstract of an individual's nonemployment driving record when evaluating the individual's application to obtain or renew motor vehicle liability insurance. Prohibits an insurer from using credit history to determine eligibility, rates or premiums for motor vehicle liability insurance. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3424
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
The Act directs DOJ to conduct a study on crime victim rights and report the findings to the legislature. (Flesch Readability Score: 62.8). Requires the Department of Justice to study improvements to crime victim rights notification procedures. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to the judiciary not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3425
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
The Act creates the crime of grooming. (Flesch Readability Score: 100.0). Creates the crime of grooming. Punishes by a maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both. Defines grooming as a sex crime requiring sex offender reporting upon conviction.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3426
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
Report Pass
4/15/25
Engrossed
4/23/25
Refer
4/23/25
The Act says that it is an offense to use a drone to interfere with firefighting and search and rescue activities. The Act changes some penalties for use of drones. (Flesch Readability Score: 67.0). [Digest: The Act says that it is an offense to use a drone to interfere with firefighting and search and rescue activities. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.6).] Expands offenses relating to the use of an unmanned aircraft system to interfere with official duties to include firefighting and search and rescue efforts. Modifies penalties for using an unmanned aircraft system to interfere with law enforcement, firefighting, search and rescue or emergency response efforts.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3427
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
The Act exempts income of a taxpayer with three or more children from tax. (Flesch Readability Score: 77.8). Creates an Oregon personal income tax subtraction for income of a taxpayer with three or more dependent children under the age of 18. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026, and before January 1, 2032. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3428
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
The Act adds a new estate tax exclusion of $1 million. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.6). Allows an additional estate tax exclusion of $1 million. Adjusts for inflation. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3429
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
The Act puts a time limit on states of emergency that the Governor declares. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.7). Provides that a state of emergency declared by the Governor terminates after 60 days unless the Legislative Assembly extends the state of emergency by joint resolution. Provides that such extensions may not exceed 60 days. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3430
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
The Act makes a new tax credit for independent physicians. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.3). Establishes an income tax credit for independent physicians. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026, and before January 1, 2032. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3431
Introduced
1/28/25
Refer
1/30/25
The Act lets people publish some notices in online news. The Act changes some laws about public notices. (Flesch Readability Score: 75.5). Expands the application of certain statutes requiring publication in a newspaper to allow publication in online news publications. Modifies the laws relating to publication of public notices.