All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB313
Introduced
2/26/25
Refer
2/26/25
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in electronic voting systems, further providing for definitions and for supplies and preparation of the voting system and of polling places and providing for pre-election logic and accuracy testing; and, in penalties, providing for falsification of election-related documentation regarding pre-election logic and accuracy testing.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB314
Introduced
2/26/25
Refer
2/26/25
An Act amending Title 25 (Elections) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in changes in records, further providing for death of registrant.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB315
Introduced
2/26/25
Refer
2/26/25
Refer
3/26/25
Report Pass
4/1/25
Engrossed
4/2/25
Refer
4/3/25
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in career and technical education, further providing for career and technical education equipment grants.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB316
Introduced
2/26/25
Refer
2/26/25
An Act amending the act of October 27, 1955 (P.L.744, No.222), known as the Pennsylvania Human Relations Act, further providing for definitions.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB317
Introduced
2/26/25
Refer
2/26/25
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in casualty insurance, providing for coverage for eating disorder treatment.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB318
Introduced
2/26/25
Refer
2/26/25
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in casualty insurance, providing for coverage for postacute neurorehabilitation.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB319
Introduced
2/26/25
Refer
2/26/25
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in commencement of proceedings, providing for execution of warrants.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB32
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions relating to operation of vehicles, providing for certain limitations in first class cities.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB320
Introduced
2/28/25
Refer
2/28/25
An Act prohibiting for-profit entities from owning or managing hospitals and health systems in this Commonwealth.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB321
Introduced
2/26/25
Refer
2/26/25
An Act relating to transfers of operations, terminations of operations, mass layoffs and changes in control.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB323
Introduced
2/26/25
Refer
2/26/25
An Act amending Title 64 (Public Authorities and Quasi-Public Corporations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in economic development financing, providing for Keystone National Finance Authority.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB324
Introduced
2/26/25
Refer
2/26/25
An Act amending Title 25 (Elections) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in penalties, providing for the offense of distribution of unofficial mail-in form; and imposing a penalty.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB326
Introduced
2/26/25
Refer
2/26/25
An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, further providing for authority to control.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB327
Introduced
2/28/25
Refer
2/28/25
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in employees, further providing for automatic certification.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB328
Introduced
2/28/25
Refer
2/28/25
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Susquehanna Regional Transportation Authority certain lands and buildings situate in the City of Harrisburg, Dauphin County.