All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB413
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act providing for statutory construction of Pennsylvania wage and hour laws.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB414
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for person with disability plate and placard.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB415
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in computer offenses, providing for the offense of ransomware; and imposing duties on the Office of Administration.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB416
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1988 (P.L.1262, No.156), known as the Local Option Small Games of Chance Act, in games of chance, providing for payment; and abrogating a regulation.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB417
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
Refer
4/2/25
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Department of Military and Veterans Affairs, further providing for Fort Indiantown Gap; and establishing the Service Members, Veterans and their Families Fund.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB418
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act amending Titles 16 (Counties) and 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in district attorney, assistants and detectives, further providing for filling of vacancies; in general provisions relating to home rule and optional plan government, further providing for limitation on municipal powers; and, in general provisions common to optional plans, further providing for manner of filling vacancies in office.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB419
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions relating to public safety, establishing the Train Derailment Emergency Grant Program and Train Derailment Emergency Grant Fund.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB42
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in inchoate crimes, further providing for prohibited offensive weapons and for possession of firearm or other dangerous weapon in court facility; in assault, further providing for assault of law enforcement officer and for discharge of firearm into an occupied structure; in theft and related offenses, further providing for definitions; in riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, further providing for prohibiting of paramilitary training; in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for definitions, for persons not to possess, use, manufacture, control, sell or transfer firearms, for firearms not to be carried without a license and for prohibited conduct during emergency, providing for 3-D printed firearms and further providing for sale or transfer of firearms, for firearm sales surcharge, for registration of firearms, for licensing of dealers and for abandonment of firearms, weapons or ammunition; and imposing penalties.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB420
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act amending the act of October 5, 1978 (P.L.1109, No.261), known as the Osteopathic Medical Practice Act, providing for disclosure of complaints filed against physicians.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB421
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1985 (P.L.457, No.112), known as the Medical Practice Act of 1985, providing for disclosure of complaints filed against physicians.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB422
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for supplemental mathematics program for kindergarten through grade five.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB423
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act amending Titles 30 (Fish) and 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in fishing licenses, providing for volunteer firefighters, volunteer special fire police officers and volunteer emergency medical service technicians; and, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for resident license and fee exemptions and for license costs and fees.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB424
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act providing for minimum energy and water efficiency standards for certain products sold in this Commonwealth; imposing penalties; and making repeals.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB426
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in organization of departmental administrative boards and commissions and of advisory boards and commissions, establishing the Legislative Youth Advisory Council and providing for duties of the Legislative Youth Advisory Council.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB427
Introduced
4/3/25
Refer
4/3/25
An Act to provide appropriations from the General Fund for the expenses of certain agencies of the Executive Department for the fiscal year July 1, 2025, to June 30, 2026, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025.