All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB400
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in qualifications of electors, further providing for qualifications of electors at primaries; in party organization, further providing for only enrolled electors to vote at primaries or hold party offices; in nomination of candidates, further providing for candidates to be nominated and party officers to be elected at primaries and providing for procedure for unenrolled electors to cast primary ballots; and, in preparation for and conduct of primaries and elections, further providing for manner of applying to vote, persons entitled to vote, voter's certificates, entries to be made in district register, numbered lists of voters and challenges.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB401
Introduced
3/6/25
Refer
3/6/25
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in tax credit and tax benefit administration, further providing for definitions; and providing for the Pennsylvania National Guard employer tax credit.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB402
Introduced
3/6/25
Refer
3/6/25
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for administration of emergency anti-seizure medication.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB403
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
Refer
3/24/25
Report Pass
3/24/25
Engrossed
3/26/25
Refer
3/31/25
An Act amending the act of November 26, 1978 (P.L.1375, No.325), known as the Dam Safety and Encroachments Act, providing for issuance of and conditions for continuous maintenance permits.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB404
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
Refer
3/24/25
Report Pass
3/24/25
Engrossed
3/26/25
Refer
3/31/25
An Act amending the act of November 26, 1978 (P.L.1375, No.325), known as the Dam Safety and Encroachments Act, providing for county conservation district stream reconstruction emergency permit authorizations.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB405
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, further providing for definitions.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB406
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act providing for regulation of the meat packing and food processing industry by creating facility health and safety committees in the workplace; establishing the industry workers' rights coordinator within the Department of Labor and Industry; and imposing penalties.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB407
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in disabled veterans' real estate tax exemption, further providing for definitions and for duty of commission.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB408
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act requiring the Department of General Services to develop a plan for divesting certain properties owned by the Commonwealth.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB411
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act amending the act of May 29, 2012 (P.L.549, No.54), known as the Stroke System of Care Act, providing for Statewide stroke registry.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB412
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in fiscal supplements to statutory programs, repealing provisions relating to regulation of rodeos or rodeo-related events.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB413
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act providing for statutory construction of Pennsylvania wage and hour laws.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB414
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for person with disability plate and placard.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB415
Introduced
3/10/25
Refer
3/10/25
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in computer offenses, providing for the offense of ransomware; and imposing duties on the Office of Administration.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB416
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1988 (P.L.1262, No.156), known as the Local Option Small Games of Chance Act, in games of chance, providing for payment; and abrogating a regulation.