All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB442
Introduced
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
An Act providing for election day registration; and prescribing penalties.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB443
Introduced
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in preparation for and conduct of primaries and elections, providing for employment leave for voters.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB444
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for definitions and for existing regulations.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB445
Introduced
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
An Act amending Title 25 (Elections) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in voter registration, further providing for application with driver's license application.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB446
Introduced
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, providing for powers reserved to the people.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB448
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending Title 54 (Names) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in judicial change of name, further providing for court approval required for change of name and for change by order of court, providing for change by administrative application and further providing for effect on children.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB449
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, providing for study to determine drug abuse by parents within resource families; and establishing the Selection and Advisory Council.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB451
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending Title 45 (Legal Notices) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in legal advertising, providing for disclosure of taxpayer-funded advertising and public notices.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB452
Introduced
3/26/25
Refer
3/26/25
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in additional special funds and restricted accounts, providing for Safe Path Restricted Account; and making a transfer.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB453
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending Title 58 (Oil and Gas) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in development, further providing for relationship to solid waste and surface mining.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB454
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1980 (P.L.380, No.97), known as the Solid Waste Management Act, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in applications and permits, further providing for permit and license application requirements; and making a repeal.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB455
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1980 (P.L.380, No.97), known as the Solid Waste Management Act, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in residual waste, further providing for disposal, processing and storage of residual waste and providing for exempt special wastes; and making an editorial change.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB456
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for appropriation bills.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB457
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth services, further providing for assistance to fire companies and EMS companies.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB458
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending the act of February 14, 2008 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Right-to-Know Law, in procedure, further providing for exceptions for public records.