All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB428
Introduced
4/3/25
Refer
4/3/25
An Act to provide appropriations from the General Fund for the expenses of certain agencies of the Executive Department for the fiscal year July 1, 2025, to June 30, 2026, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB429
Introduced
4/3/25
Refer
4/3/25
An Act to provide appropriations from the General Fund for the expenses of certain agencies of the Executive Department for the fiscal year July 1, 2025, to June 30, 2026, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB43
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for definitions.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB430
Introduced
4/3/25
Refer
4/3/25
An Act to provide appropriations from the General Fund for the expenses of certain agencies of the Executive Department for the fiscal year July 1, 2025, to June 30, 2026, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB431
Introduced
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
An Act amending the act of February 14, 2008 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Right-to-Know Law, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in procedure, providing for acceptable denials.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB432
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in the State System of Higher Education, providing for educational opportunities for foster and adopted children.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB433
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in intermediate units, further providing for powers and duties of the intermediate unit board of directors and for capital subsidy.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB434
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions relating to marriage, repealing provisions relating to marriage between persons of the same sex.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB435
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for appointing power of the Governor.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB436
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for definitions, for reporting procedure, for disposition of complaints received, for responsibility for investigation, for access to information in Statewide database, for information in Statewide database and for release of information in confidential reports.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB437
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending the act of October 27, 1955 (P.L.744, No.222), known as the Pennsylvania Human Relations Act, providing for duties of commission relating to name changes by certain individuals.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB438
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act providing for regulatory compliance.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB439
Introduced
3/17/25
Refer
3/17/25
An Act amending the act of July 14, 1961 (P.L.604, No.304), known as The Apprenticeship and Training Act, further providing for powers and duties; providing for supervision; and abrogating a regulation.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB440
Introduced
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in Pennsylvania Economic Development for a Growing Economy (PA EDGE) tax credits relating to semiconductor manufacturing and biomedical manufacturing and research, further providing for definitions, for eligibility, for application and approval of tax credit and for sale or assignment.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB441
Introduced
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
An Act amending Title 4 (Amusements) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in table games, further providing for table game taxes; and making a repeal.