All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB522
Introduced
3/26/25
Refer
3/26/25
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, providing for Collaborative Care Model and Primary Care Behavioral Health Model Implementation Program.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB523
Introduced
3/26/25
Refer
3/26/25
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions relating to emergency management services, providing for health screenings for firefighters and EMS providers.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB524
Introduced
3/26/25
Refer
3/26/25
An Act amending Titles 27 (Environmental Resources) and 58 (Oil and Gas) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in administrative provisions, providing for definitions, for coal-powered plants, for regulations, for natural gas and coal permit database, for natural gas and coal permit review procedure and for withdrawal from Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative; in development relating to oil and gas, further providing for well permits and providing for leases in State parks and forests; and making an editorial change.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB526
Introduced
3/26/25
Refer
3/26/25
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in tax credit and tax benefit administration, further providing for definitions; providing for volunteer certified emergency medical technician and volunteer firefighter tax credit; and imposing duties on the Department of Revenue.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB527
Introduced
3/26/25
Refer
3/26/25
An Act amending the act of December 31, 1965 (P.L.1257, No.511), known as The Local Tax Enabling Act, further providing for title of act; providing for local taxes in cities of the first class, for prohibition of tax on certain individuals and for reimbursement of taxes; and making repeals.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB528
Introduced
3/26/25
Refer
3/26/25
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB529
Introduced
3/26/25
Refer
3/26/25
An Act establishing the Emergency Medical Services Certification Program; imposing duties on the Bureau of Emergency Medical Services within the Department of Health; providing for funding; and making an appropriation.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB53
Introduced
1/29/25
Refer
1/29/25
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in casualty insurance, further providing for conditions subject to which policies are to be issued and for health insurance coverage for certain children of insured parents.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB530
Introduced
3/27/25
Refer
3/27/25
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for exclusions from tax.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB531
Introduced
4/2/25
Refer
4/2/25
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, further providing for award of grants.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB532
Introduced
4/2/25
Refer
4/2/25
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, providing for private parking lots.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB533
Introduced
4/2/25
Refer
4/2/25
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for license requirements; and, in special licenses and permits, further providing for regulated hunting grounds permits.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB534
Introduced
3/28/25
Refer
3/28/25
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in veterans' pensions and benefits, further providing for blind veteran's pension and for amputee and paralyzed veteran's pension.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB535
Introduced
4/2/25
Refer
4/2/25
An Act amending the act of October 5, 1978 (P.L.1109, No.261), known as the Osteopathic Medical Practice Act, further providing for definitions and for genetic counselor.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB536
Introduced
4/2/25
Refer
4/2/25
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1985 (P.L.457, No.112), known as the Medical Practice Act of 1985, further providing for definitions and for genetic counselor.