All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB566

Introduced
4/4/25  
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions and for application.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB568

Introduced
4/4/25  
An Act providing for the removal of nonconsenting intimate depictions from social media platforms.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB569

Introduced
4/9/25  
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, establishing the Snow and Ice Removal Safety Grant Program and the Snow and Ice Removal Safety Grant Program Account; and imposing duties on the Department of Transportation.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB570

Introduced
4/11/25  
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for End of Life Options Act; imposing duties on the Department of Health; and imposing penalties.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB571

Introduced
4/9/25  
An Act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to join the Interstate Compact; providing for the form of the compact; imposing additional powers and duties on the Governor, the Secretary of the Commonwealth and the Compact.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB572

Introduced
4/9/25  
An Act amending Title 74 (Transportation) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in turnpike, providing for State intercept for unpaid tolls.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB573

Introduced
4/9/25  
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for blood donation education.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB574

Introduced
4/9/25  
An Act amending Title 15 (Corporations and Unincorporated Associations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in corporate powers, duties and safeguards, further providing for additional powers of certain public utility corporations.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB575

Introduced
4/9/25  
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of ethnic intimidation; and making an editorial change.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB576

Introduced
4/9/25  
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in mutual thrift institutions tax, further providing for imposition, report and payment of tax and exemptions.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB577

Introduced
4/9/25  
An Act amending the act of May 25, 1933 (P.L.1050, No.242), referred to as the Second Class City Firemen Relief Law, further providing for requirements of membership, for married persons and pensions to surviving spouses and for eligibility of surviving spouses.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB578

Introduced
4/9/25  
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in financial responsibility, further providing for availability, scope and amount of coverage, repealing provisions relating to request for lower limits of coverage, providing for offer of lower limits of coverage, repealing provisions relating to coverages in excess of required amounts and to stacking of uninsured and underinsured benefits and option to waive, providing for stacking of uninsured and underinsured benefits prohibited and further providing for notice of available benefits and limits and for availability of uninsured, underinsured, bodily injury liability and property damage coverages and mandatory deductibles.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB579

Introduced
4/9/25  
An Act amending the act of July 9, 1987 (P.L.220, No.39), known as the Social Workers, Marriage and Family Therapists and Professional Counselors Act, providing for licensing and regulating the practice of music therapy; and making editorial changes.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB58

Introduced
1/22/25  
An Act establishing the Medicaid Care Transition Program; and imposing duties on the Department of Human Services.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB581

Introduced
4/9/25  
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1975 (P.L.604, No.173), entitled "An act to facilitate the use of electronic funds transfer systems by providing that credits to accounts in financial institutions designated by recipients shall satisfy legal requirements for payments by cash or checks," further providing for electronic funds transfers, for consumer protections and for payroll card accounts.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records