All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB628

Introduced
4/11/25  
An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, further providing for definitions and for misbranding.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB629

Introduced
4/11/25  
An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in food protection, providing for labeling of food products with gluten-containing grains.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB63

Introduced
1/22/25  
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for definitions, for driving under influence of alcohol or controlled substance and for authorized use not a defense.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB630

Introduced
4/11/25  
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in support of the indigent, further providing for definitions and for relatives' liability and procedure.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB631

Introduced
4/11/25  
An Act providing for parental consent for virtual mental health services provided by a school entity.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB632

Introduced
4/11/25  
An Act amending the act of July 28, 1953 (P.L.723, No.230), known as the Second Class County Code, providing for the voluntary dissolution of the existing form of governance of a municipal corporation located in a county of the second class and the creation of unincorporated districts of counties of the second class; authorizing the county to assume responsibility for the governance of the municipal corporation and delivery of public services to the citizens residing in the municipal corporation through the administration of an unincorporated district; authorizing unincorporated district advisory committees; and making a repeal.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB633

Introduced
4/11/25  
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in emergency medical services system, further providing for injured police animals.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB634

Introduced
4/14/25  
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, providing for the offense of hate crimes against law enforcement officers and first responders.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB635

Introduced
4/14/25  
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in other offenses, further providing for drug trafficking sentencing and penalties.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB636

Introduced
4/14/25  
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for exclusions from tax.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB637

Introduced
4/14/25  
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in types of optional plans of government, further providing for qualifications of municipal manager.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB638

Introduced
4/14/25  
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in primary and election expenses, further providing for place of filing.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB639

Introduced
4/14/25  
An Act amending Title 15 (Corporations and Unincorporated Associations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in corporate powers, duties and safeguards, further providing for additional powers of certain public utility corporations.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB64

Introduced
1/22/25  
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in veteran-owned small businesses, providing for veteran-owned business logotype; and imposing a penalty.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB640

Introduced
4/14/25  
An Act amending the act of December 17, 1968 (P.L.1224, No.387), known as the Unfair Trade Practices and Consumer Protection Law, further providing for definitions and for unlawful acts or practices and exclusions.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records