All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB641
Introduced
4/14/25
Refer
4/14/25
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in administrative organization, further providing for Pennsylvania State Police; and making a repeal.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB642
Introduced
4/14/25
Refer
4/14/25
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for establishment of Statewide database, for access to information in Statewide database, for information in Statewide database, for disposition of founded and indicated reports, for amendment or expunction of information, for employees having contact with children and adoptive and foster parents, for information relating to certified or licensed child-care home residents, for continued employment or participation in program, activity or service and for investigation of reports.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB643
Introduced
4/21/25
Refer
4/21/25
An Act amending the act of October 27, 1955 (P.L.744, No.222), known as the Pennsylvania Human Relations Act, further providing for definitions; prohibiting use of criminal history and retaliation relating to use of criminal history; providing for notice to prospective occupants and tenants relating to use of criminal history and for exclusions and other legal requirements relating to use of criminal history; and further providing for procedure and for civil penalties.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB644
Introduced
4/21/25
Refer
4/21/25
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in decrees and records, further providing for definitions and for original birth record.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB645
Introduced
4/21/25
Refer
4/21/25
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in terms and courses of study, further providing for subjects of instruction and flag code and providing for handwriting instruction required; and, in charter schools, further providing for provisions applicable to charter schools and for applicability of other provisions of this act and of other acts and regulations.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB646
Introduced
4/21/25
Refer
4/21/25
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in additional special funds and restricted accounts, establishing the Survivor-Centered, Accessible, Fair and Empowering Housing Trust Fund; and making an interfund transfer.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB647
Introduced
4/21/25
Refer
4/21/25
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in public indecency, further providing for prostitution and related offenses.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB648
An Act establishing requirements for hospital-based financial assistance; providing for hospital-based financial assistance forms, for information about hospital-based financial assistance programs and for reporting of hospital-based financial assistance policies; and imposing duties on the Department of Health.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB649
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in forgery and fraudulent practices, providing for the offense of digital forgery.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB65
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
Refer
3/31/25
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for schedule of convictions and points; in rules of the road in general, further providing for meeting or overtaking school bus; and imposing penalties.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB650
Introduced
4/21/25
Refer
4/21/25
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in departmental powers and duties as to licensing, further providing for right to enter and inspect.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB652
Introduced
4/21/25
Refer
4/21/25
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general principals of justification, further providing for definitions.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB653
Introduced
4/21/25
Refer
4/21/25
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB654
Introduced
4/21/25
Refer
4/21/25
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions, establishing the Veterans Mental Health Services Program.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB655
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income; in corporate net income tax, further providing for definitions; in tax credit and tax benefit administration, further providing for definitions; and providing for personal health investment tax credit.