All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB656

Introduced
4/28/25  
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in corporate net income tax, further providing for definitions, for reports and payment of tax and for consolidated reports; and, in general provisions, further providing for underpayment of estimated tax.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB658

Introduced
4/28/25  
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in dates of elections and primaries and special elections, further providing for affidavits of candidates; and, in nomination of candidates, further providing for affidavits of candidates, for nominations by political bodies, for limitations on eligibility of candidates and for affidavits of candidates.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB659

An Act amending Title 58 (Oil and Gas) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in utilization, providing for combustible gas detectors; and imposing a penalty.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB66

Introduced
1/22/25  
An Act amending Title 65 (Public Officers) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in ethics standards and financial disclosure, further providing for definitions, for restricted activities and for penalties.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB660

An Act amending Title 58 (Oil and Gas) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in development, further providing for definitions, for well reporting requirements and for hydraulic fracturing chemical disclosure requirements.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB661

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in budget and finance, establishing the Animal Cruelty Investigation Fund.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB662

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in cruelty to animals, providing for concurrent jurisdiction to prosecute felony offenses.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB663

Introduced
4/28/25  
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for deaf and hard of hearing education.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB665

Introduced
4/28/25  
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for Safe Exchange Zone Program.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB666

Introduced
4/28/25  
An Act amending Title 4 (Amusements) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, further providing for regulatory authority of board and for number of slot machines.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB668

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in firearms and other dangerous articles, providing for identification required for purchase of firearm ammunition; and imposing penalties.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB67

Introduced
3/3/25  
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Game Commission, further providing for organization of commission; in game or wildlife protection, further providing for regulations, for report to commission officer, for surrender of carcass to commission officer and for unlawful activities; and, in hunting and furtaking, repealing provisions relating to hunting on Sunday prohibited, further providing for unlawful devices and methods and for the offense of trespass on private property while hunting and repealing provisions relating to hunting on Sunday without written permission.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB670

Introduced
4/28/25  
An Act amending the act of May 28, 1937 (P.L.955, No.265), referred to as the Housing Authorities Law, providing for public housing safety committees; further providing for requirements regarding tenants and landlords in cities of the first class; and providing for background checks for landlords.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB671

An Act amending the act of June 29, 1996 (P.L.434, No.67), known as the Job Enhancement Act, in Community Development Bank Grant and Loan Program, further providing for definitions and providing for financial assistance to air ambulance crash impacted businesses.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB673

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in fiscal supplements to statutory programs, establishing a tracking system for publicly financed housing.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records