All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB670

Introduced
4/28/25  
An Act amending the act of May 28, 1937 (P.L.955, No.265), referred to as the Housing Authorities Law, providing for public housing safety committees; further providing for requirements regarding tenants and landlords in cities of the first class; and providing for background checks for landlords.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB671

An Act amending the act of June 29, 1996 (P.L.434, No.67), known as the Job Enhancement Act, in Community Development Bank Grant and Loan Program, further providing for definitions and providing for financial assistance to air ambulance crash impacted businesses.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB673

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in fiscal supplements to statutory programs, establishing a tracking system for publicly financed housing.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB674

An Act establishing the Rural Coworking and Innovation Center Grant Program; and providing for requirements and imposing duties on the Department of Community and Economic Development.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB676

An Act amending the act of December 17, 1968 (P.L.1224, No.387), known as the Unfair Trade Practices and Consumer Protection Law, providing for unlawful retention policy.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB677

An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rates and distribution systems, further providing for valuation of acquired water and wastewater systems.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB678

An Act amending the act of July 14, 1961 (P.L.637, No.329), known as the Wage Payment and Collection Law, further providing for definitions; and providing for specific liability.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB679

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for minimum hourly wage or living wage for education support professionals; in duties and powers of boards of school directors, further providing for majority vote required and recording; and imposing duties on the Department of Labor and Industry.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB68

Introduced
1/22/25  
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in arson, criminal mischief and other property destruction, further providing for the offense of institutional vandalism.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB682

An Act amending the act of June 28, 1995 (P.L.89, No.18), known as the Conservation and Natural Resources Act, in renaming Department of Environmental Resources and defining rulemaking authority of Department of Environmental Protection, repealing provisions relating to Department of Environmental Protection and providing for Department of Environmental Services; and making editorial changes.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB683

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in burglary and other criminal intrusion, providing for offenses relating to critical infrastructure facilities; and imposing penalties.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB684

Introduced
4/28/25  
An Act amending Title 58 (Oil and Gas) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in development, further providing for notification to public drinking water systems.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB685

Introduced
4/28/25  
An Act amending the act of January 8, 1960 (1959 P.L.2119, No.787), known as the Air Pollution Control Act, further providing for powers and duties of the Department of Environmental Protection and for civil penalties.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB686

An Act amending the act of February 14, 2008 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Right-to-Know Law, in judicial review, providing for criminal penalty.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB687

An Act amending Title 62 (Procurement) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in procurement organization, further providing for specific construction powers, duties and procedures; in procurement of construction and design professional services, further providing for procurement of design professional services; providing for project delivery methods; and making a repeal.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records