All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB705
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in voting by qualified mail-in electors, further providing for applications for official mail-in ballots.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB71
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act designating the Pennsylvania Judicial Center as the Chief Justice Robert N. C. Nix, Jr. Judicial Center; and imposing duties on the Department of General Services.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB73
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in State lottery, further providing for definitions and providing for disclosure of certain prizewinner identities.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB75
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, further providing for prohibited acts and penalties.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB76
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending the act of April 17, 2016 (P.L.84, No.16), known as the Medical Marijuana Act, in patients, providing for cultivating cannabis for personal use.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB77
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in pupils and attendance, further providing for excuses from attending school.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB78
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
Engrossed
3/24/25
Refer
3/25/25
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 67586, located over the South Branch of Bear Run on State Route 1053 in Banks Township, Indiana County, as the PFC John Tabacsko Memorial Bridge.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB79
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in limitation of time relating to criminal proceedings, further providing for other offenses.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB81
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to join the Dentist and Dental Hygienist Compact; and providing for the form of the compact.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB82
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for Lieutenant Governor.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB83
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending Title 44 (Law and Justice) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in constables, further providing for restricted account and for fees.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB84
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in construction and renovation of buildings by school entities, further providing for definitions and for building condition assessments.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB85
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in fiscal provisions relating to public assistance, providing for distribution of SNAP benefits.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB86
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for in-State tuition for undocumented individuals.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB87
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending the act of May 28, 1937 (P.L.955, No.265), referred to as the Housing Authorities Law, providing for training requirement for members of authority.