All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB89
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending the act of November 3, 2022 (P.L.2158, No.158), known as the Overdose Mapping Act, further providing for definitions and for establishment and design; and providing for entry requirements for EMS providers.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB9
Introduced
2/3/25
Refer
2/3/25
An Act providing for sport activities in public institutions of higher education and public school entities to be expressly designated male, female or coed; and creating causes of action for harm suffered by designation.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB90
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth services, further providing for curriculum, training and education certification management system.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB91
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending the act of December 16, 1998 (P.L.980, No.129), known as the Police Officer, Firefighter, Correction Employee and National Guard Member Child Beneficiary Education Act, further providing for definitions and for Postsecondary Educational Gratuity Program; and repealing provisions relating to retroactivity.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB92
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
Engrossed
4/1/25
Refer
4/3/25
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in criminal homicide, further providing for the offense of drug delivery resulting in death; and imposing a penalty.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB93
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending Title 4 (Amusements) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in revenues relating to gaming, providing for revenue from expansion of gaming.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB94
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending the act of June 27, 2006 (1st Sp.Sess., P.L.1873, No.1), known as the Taxpayer Relief Act, in senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for definitions.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB95
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending the act of September 27, 1961 (P.L.1700, No.699), known as the Pharmacy Act, further providing for definitions and for unlawful acts.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB96
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
Refer
3/26/25
Report Pass
4/1/25
Engrossed
4/1/25
Refer
4/3/25
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of terroristic threats.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB97
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act amending Titles 65 (Public Officers) and 74 (Transportation) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in ethics standards and financial disclosure, further providing for definitions, for restricted activities, for statement of financial interests and for penalties; in lobbying disclosure, further providing for definitions, for reporting and for penalties; and, in Turnpike Commission standards of conduct, further providing for code of conduct.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB98
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
An Act providing for museum unclaimed loaned property.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR1
Introduced
1/7/25
Passed
1/7/25
Passed
1/7/25
Passed
1/7/25
A Resolution adopting Ethical Conduct Rules of the Senate.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR10
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
A Resolution recognizing January 27, 2025, as "International Holocaust Remembrance Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR11
Introduced
1/22/25
Refer
1/22/25
A Resolution designating January 23, 2025, as "Maternal Health Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania to recognize all the women and birthing people who die from complications of pregnancy or childbirth.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR12
Introduced
1/27/25
Passed
1/27/25
A Resolution honoring the life and achievements of former President Jimmy Carter, the 39th President of the United States.