All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR13
Introduced
1/27/25
Passed
1/27/25
A Resolution recognizing January 27, 2025, as "International Holocaust Remembrance Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR14
Introduced
1/28/25
Passed
1/28/25
A Resolution recognizing the distinguished career of Vincent C. DeLiberato, Jr., Esq., and honoring his service to the Commonwealth.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR15
Introduced
2/3/25
Refer
2/3/25
A Resolution designating February 3, 2025, as "Four Chaplains Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR16
Introduced
2/3/25
Refer
2/3/25
A Resolution designating the week of January 26 through February 1, 2025, as "Catholic Schools Week" in Pennsylvania and expressing congratulations and appreciation to Catholic elementary and secondary schools across this Commonwealth.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR17
Introduced
1/31/25
Refer
1/31/25
A Resolution recognizing February 7, 2025, as "National Wear Red Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR18
Introduced
1/31/25
Refer
1/31/25
A Resolution recognizing the month of February 2025 as "Black History Month" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR19
Introduced
1/31/25
Refer
1/31/25
A Resolution recognizing the week of February 15 through 22, 2025, as "National FFA Week" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR2
Introduced
1/7/25
Passed
1/7/25
A Resolution adopting Financial Operating Rules of the Senate.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR20
Introduced
2/4/25
Refer
2/4/25
A Resolution commemorating January 15, 2025, as the 50th anniversary of the Philip Jaisohn Memorial Foundation.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR21
Introduced
2/5/25
Passed
2/5/25
A Resolution recognizing the month of February 2025 as "Black History Month" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR22
Introduced
2/20/25
Refer
2/20/25
A Resolution amending Senate Rule 14, further providing for committees.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR23
Introduced
2/20/25
Refer
2/20/25
A Resolution designating the week of February 9 through 15, 2025, as "Cardiac Rehabilitation Week" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR24
Introduced
2/25/25
Refer
2/25/25
A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to pass a food labeling modernization act and an allergen disclosure in non-food articles act.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR25
Introduced
2/13/25
Refer
2/13/25
A Resolution designating the month of February 2025 as "Career and Technical Education Month" in Pennsylvania.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR26
Introduced
2/28/25
Refer
2/28/25
A Resolution designating the week of February 17 through 23, 2025, as "THON Week" in Pennsylvania and honoring the work of The Pennsylvania State University IFC/Panhellenic Dance Marathon student volunteers.